USA v. Approximately $23,857.90 US Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $23,857.90 US Currency
Case Number: 2:2019cv00213
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 Warrant of Arrest In Rem - Returned EXECUTED by United States of America re Approximately $23,857.90 US Currency. (Donovan, Brian)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF A WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM; ECF No. #3 . Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (TR, Case Administrator)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Praecipe filed by United States of America: Re #3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant In Rem . Description: to correct the U.S. Attorney name. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Warrant of Arrest In Rem)(Donovan, Brian)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Praecipe filed by United States of America: Re #2 Amended Complaint. Description: to correct the U.S. Attorney name throughout the document. (Donovan, Brian)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant In Rem by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 8/22/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Warrant of Arrest In Rem)(Donovan, Brian)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Approximately $23,857.90 US Currency. Filed by United States of America.(Donovan, Brian)
June 18, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Approximately $23,857.90 U.S. Currency Fee Waived Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donovan, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Approximately $23,857.90 US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $23,857.90 US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?