Hall v. Machol & Johannes LLC
Plaintiff: Ian Hall
Defendant: Machol & Johannes LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00239
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - By Court: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference has been set for 10/1/2019 at 9:30 a.m. via teleconference before Judge Stanley A Bastian. Participants should plan to call the Court Conference line: 1-888-636-3807 / Access code: 8839796 (No security code) five minutes before the conference. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Proceed Before Magstrate Judge)(ES, Courtroom Deputy)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Machol & Johannes LLC.(Lockwood, William)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File A Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs Complaint, ECF No. #3 , is GRANTED. Defendant shall file any response to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than August 30, 2019. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (SG, Case Administrator)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Machol & Johannes LLC. (Lockwood, William)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Machol & Johannes LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Lockwood, William)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Machol & Johannes LLC. (SG, Case Administrator)
July 12, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Machol & Johannes LLC ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3210893) Jury Demand. Filed by Ian Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Miller, Kirk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Machol & Johannes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Hall
Represented By: Brian Cameron
Represented By: Shayne Sutherland
Represented By: Kirk D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Machol & Johannes LLC
Represented By: William Gregory Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?