Jones et al v. Grant County Hospital District #1
Plaintiff: Russell Jones and Reina Jones
Defendant: Grant County Hospital Dist. No. 1 d/b/a Samaritan Hospital and Grant County Hospital District #1
Case Number: 2:2019cv00264
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION by Diane Pefley-Crawford in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Quash Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(5) for Insufficient Service of Process filed by All Plaintiffs. (Best, Ryan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Quash Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(5) for Insufficient Service of Process filed by All Plaintiffs. (Best, Ryan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Grant County Hospital District #1. (Best, Ryan)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Grant County Hospital District #1. (Best, Ryan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION by Julie Weisenburg in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Quash Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(5) for Insufficient Service of Process filed by Grant County Hospital District #1. (Mensik, Amy)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION by Virginia Valdez in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Quash Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(5) for Insufficient Service of Process filed by Grant County Hospital District #1. (Mensik, Amy)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Quash Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(5) for Insufficient Service of Process by Grant County Hospital District #1. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mensik, Amy)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance (Special) by Amy M Mensik on behalf of Grant County Hospital District #1 (Attorney Amy M Mensik added to party Grant County Hospital District #1(pty:dft))(Mensik, Amy)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re Grant County Hospital District #1. (Best, Ryan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Grant County Hospital District #1. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
July 31, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grant County Hospital Dist. No. 1 d/b/a Samaritan Hospital ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3226214) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Best, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Grant County Hospital District #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Jones
Represented By: Jacob A Mark
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reina Jones
Represented By: Jacob A Mark
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant County Hospital Dist. No. 1 d/b/a Samaritan Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant County Hospital District #1
Represented By: Amy M Mensik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?