Eilmes et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Kenneth Noel Eilmes, Jr and Kelleen Patrice Eilmes
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00271
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Case transferred from Washington Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-05345, filed 08/26/2019. (RG, Chief Deputy)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to Northern District of California. Signed by John W. Nichols, MDL Clerk. (JW, ECF Admin)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (AY, Case Administrator)
August 8, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3233957) Jury Demand. Filed by Kenneth Noel Eilmes, Jr, Kelleen Patrice Eilmes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Yackulic, Corrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eilmes et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Noel Eilmes, Jr
Represented By: Corrie Johnson Yackulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelleen Patrice Eilmes
Represented By: Corrie Johnson Yackulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?