Chaney et al v. Auto Trackers and Recovery North LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lucas M Chaney, Kathleen Chaney and T C
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA Inc, Patrick K Willis Company Inc and Auto Trackers and Recovery North LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00272
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Patrick K Willis Company Inc. (Pincock, Trevor)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Santander Consumer USA Inc. (Pincock, Trevor)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM by Patrick K. Willis Co. Inc. against Auto Trackers and Recovery North LLC by Santander Consumer USA Inc, Patrick K Willis Company Inc.(Pincock, Trevor)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/26/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 01:45 PM in Spokane Courtroom 755. Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 755.Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (AY, Case Administrator)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Judge Stanley A Bastian: Scheduling Conference held on 9/25/2019. (Reported/Recorded by: None) (ES, Courtroom Deputy)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT (Certificate and Rule 26 report) by T C, Kathleen Chaney, Lucas M Chaney. (Trueblood, Alexander)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Hausberg on behalf of Patrick K Willis Company Inc, Santander Consumer USA Inc (Attorney Charles Hausberg added to party Patrick K Willis Company Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Hausberg added to party Santander Consumer USA Inc(pty:dft))(Hausberg, Charles)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor R Pincock on behalf of Patrick K Willis Company Inc, Santander Consumer USA Inc (Attorney Trevor R Pincock added to party Patrick K Willis Company Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Trevor R Pincock added to party Santander Consumer USA Inc(pty:dft))(Pincock, Trevor)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE : A Telephonic Scheduling Conference has been set for 9/25/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Yakima Courtroom 203 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. Participants should plan to call the Court Conference line: 1-888-636-3807 / Access code: 8839796 (No security code) five minutes before the conference. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Proceed Before Magstrate Judge)(ES, Courtroom Deputy)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Auto Trackers and Recovery North LLC.(Donohue, Alfred)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alfred E Donohue on behalf of Auto Trackers and Recovery North LLC (Attorney Alfred E Donohue added to party Auto Trackers and Recovery North LLC(pty:dft))(Donohue, Alfred)
August 11, 2019 Filing 3 Praecipe filed by All Plaintiffs : Re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,. Description: Minor's name was not redacted. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Trueblood, Alexander)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (AY, Case Administrator)
August 9, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3234391) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Trueblood, Alexander) Modified on 8/9/2019 - Main Document no longer viewable to the public - filing contains personal identifiers. Attorney to file Praecipe. (AY, Case Administrator). Modified on 8/21/2019 See ECF No. #3 Complaint. (AY, Case Administrator).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaney et al v. Auto Trackers and Recovery North LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA Inc
Represented By: Charles Hausberg
Represented By: Trevor R Pincock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick K Willis Company Inc
Represented By: Charles Hausberg
Represented By: Trevor R Pincock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Trackers and Recovery North LLC
Represented By: Alfred E Donohue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas M Chaney
Represented By: Alexander Burnaby Trueblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: Alexander Burnaby Trueblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T C
Represented By: Alexander Burnaby Trueblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?