Cunningham v. Federal Bureau of Investigations et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Joseph Cunningham
Defendant: 2 Unknown Named Agents, Federal Bureau of Investigations and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00318
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING #6 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (TR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO AMEND OR FILE A MOTION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Plaintiff may file within 60 days of the date of this order an amended complaint or attached motion to voluntarily dismiss complaint or risk dismissal and a 'strike' under 28 USC 1915(g). Amended Complaint/Voluntary Dismissal Deadline set for 1/13/2020. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint)(TR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting application to proceed In Forma Pauperis, Directing Institution to calculate, collect, and forward payment; application by plaintiff to proceed IFP is granted; an initial partial filing fee will be calculated and collected by Spokane County Jail, Attention: Jail Office Supervisor, 1100 West Mallon Avenue, Spokane, Washington 99260 (agency having custody of plaintiff). cc of Order and Acknowledgment/Authorization sent to agency. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (TR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Aaron Joseph Cunningham. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope)(PL, Case Administrator)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (CV, Case Administrator)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 2 Unknown Named Agents, Federal Bureau of Investigations, and United States of America (Filing Fee $400 - IFP Pending) Filed by Aaron Joseph Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope)(CV, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. Federal Bureau of Investigations et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2 Unknown Named Agents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Joseph Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?