Akins et al v. Robb et al
Plaintiff: Akins Jackie, Jr, Jackie L Akins, Sr, Cassandra Akins and Jackie Akins, Jr
Defendant: Spokane Police Officers Does 1-30, Summer Abrahamson, Gregory Lebsock, Raufu Everette, Krishana Everette, Bryan Robb, City of Spokane Washington, JC Anderson and D Betts
Case Number: 2:2019cv00363
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 32 Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Judge Stanley A Bastian: Scheduling Conference held on 12/19/2019. (Reported/Recorded by: Not Reported) Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail on 12/19/2019 (ES, Courtroom Deputy).
December 12, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Bryan Robb and Krishana Everette by Bryan Robb.(Miller, J)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AS MOOT. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals On November 27, 2019, all Plaintiffs in this case were granted in forma pauperis status. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (TR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
December 9, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Text entry; no PDF document: - Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail. The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set 12/10/2019 at 10:30 a.m. has been rescheduled for 12/19/2019 at 10:30 AM by Teleconference before Judge Stanley A Bastian. Participants should plan to call the Court Conference line: 1-888-204-5984 / Access code: 6790153 (No security code) five minutes before the conference.(ES, Courtroom Deputy)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING ECF Nos. #24 , #25 , and #26 MOTIONS FOR CM/ECF LOGIN AND PASSWORD. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (TR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
November 29, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password by Jackie Akins, Jr. Motion Hearing set for 12/30/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TR, Case Administrator)
November 29, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password by Cassandra Akins. Motion Hearing set for 12/30/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TR, Case Administrator)
November 29, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password by Jackie L Akins, Sr. Motion Hearing set for 12/30/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TR, Case Administrator)
November 27, 2019 Filing 23 Joint Certificate Pursuant to Rule 26 / Rule 16 DISCOVERY PLAN by JC Anderson, D Betts, City of Spokane Washington, Gregory Lebsock, Spokane Police Officers Does 1-30. (Odle, Nathaniel)
November 27, 2019 Filing 22 Joint Certificate Pursuant to Rule 26 / Rule 16 by JC Anderson, D Betts, City of Spokane Washington, Gregory Lebsock, Spokane Police Officers Does 1-30. (Odle, Nathaniel)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiffs are granted in forma pauperis status. The District Court Executive shall set a case management review for 30 days, and immediately notify the assigned judicial officer, who will review the Complaint for legal sufficiency. IT IS SO ORDERED. - Text entry;no PDF document. Case Management Deadline set for 12/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
November 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of Address by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TR, Case Administrator)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Show Cause Response due by 12/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (TR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
November 21, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackie Akins, Jr re Krishana Everette. (TR, Case Administrator)
November 19, 2019 Filing 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : - Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.A Telephonic Scheduling Conference has been set for 12/10/2019 at 10:30 a.m. by teleconference before Judge Stanley A Bastian. Participants should plan to call the Court Conference line: 1-888-204-5984 / Access code: 6790153 (No security code) five minutes before the conference. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Proceed Before Magstrate Judge)(ES, Courtroom Deputy)
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by JC Anderson, D Betts, City of Spokane Washington, Gregory Lebsock, Spokane Police Officers Does 1-30.(Odle, Nathaniel)
November 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Salvatore J Faggiano on behalf of JC Anderson, D Betts, City of Spokane Washington, Gregory Lebsock, Spokane Police Officers Does 1-30 (Attorney Salvatore J Faggiano added to party JC Anderson(pty:dft), Attorney Salvatore J Faggiano added to party D Betts(pty:dft), Attorney Salvatore J Faggiano added to party City of Spokane Washington(pty:dft), Attorney Salvatore J Faggiano added to party Gregory Lebsock(pty:dft), Attorney Salvatore J Faggiano added to party Spokane Police Officers Does 1-30(pty:dft))(Faggiano, Salvatore)
November 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel J Odle on behalf of JC Anderson, D Betts, City of Spokane Washington, Gregory Lebsock, Spokane Police Officers Does 1-30 (Attorney Nathaniel J Odle added to party JC Anderson(pty:dft), Attorney Nathaniel J Odle added to party D Betts(pty:dft), Attorney Nathaniel J Odle added to party City of Spokane Washington(pty:dft), Attorney Nathaniel J Odle added to party Gregory Lebsock(pty:dft), Attorney Nathaniel J Odle added to party Spokane Police Officers Does 1-30(pty:dft))(Odle, Nathaniel)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackie Akins, Jr, Cassandra Akins, Jackie L Akins, Sr re Bryan Robb. (PL, Case Administrator)
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackie Akins, Jr, Cassandra Akins, Jackie L Akins, Sr re Gregory Lebsock. (PL, Case Administrator)
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackie Akins, Jr, Cassandra Akins, Jackie L Akins, Sr re City of Spokane Washington. (PL, Case Administrator)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackie Akins, Jr, Cassandra Akins, Jackie L Akins, Sr re D Betts. (PL, Case Administrator)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackie Akins, Jr, Cassandra Akins, Jackie L Akins, Sr re JC Anderson. (PL, Case Administrator)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance for Defendants Bryan Robb and Krishana Everette by J Scott Miller on behalf of Bryan Robb (Attorney J Scott Miller added to party Bryan Robb(pty:dft))(Miller, J)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals addresses the income and assets of only one of the three plaintiffs, and it is unclear if the application is completed by Jackie L. Adkins, Sr. or Jackie L. Adkins, Jr. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiffs shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Case Management Deadline set for 11/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (TR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Summer Abrahamson, JC Anderson, D Betts, City of Spokane Washington, Krishana Everette, Raufu Everette, Gregory Lebsock, Bryan Robb, Spokane Police Officers Does 1-30. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Summer Abrahamson, JC Anderson, D Betts, City of Spokane Washington, Krishana Everette, Raufu Everette, Gregory Lebsock, Bryan Robb, Spokane Police Officers Does 1-30 (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # IFP Pending) Jury Demand. Filed by Akins Jackie, Jr, Cassandra Akins, Jackie L Akins, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(AN, Courtroom Deputy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akins et al v. Robb et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spokane Police Officers Does 1-30
Represented By: Nathaniel J Odle
Represented By: Salvatore J Faggiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summer Abrahamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Lebsock
Represented By: Nathaniel J Odle
Represented By: Salvatore J Faggiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raufu Everette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krishana Everette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Robb
Represented By: J Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Spokane Washington
Represented By: Nathaniel J Odle
Represented By: Salvatore J Faggiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JC Anderson
Represented By: Nathaniel J Odle
Represented By: Salvatore J Faggiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Betts
Represented By: Nathaniel J Odle
Represented By: Salvatore J Faggiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akins Jackie, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie L Akins, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Akins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Akins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?