Hickey et ux v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: James Terrence Hickey, III and Vickie L Hickey
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00391
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Remark - Case transferred from Washington Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:20-cv-00119, filed 01/06/2020. (CV, Case Administrator)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Terrence Hickey, III, Vickie L Hickey re Monsanto Company. (Larsen, Wes)
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to Northern District of California. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of MDL Panel. (JW, ECF Admin)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Regarding Potential Multidistrict Litigation Case (Larsen, Wes)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (AY, Case Administrator)
November 14, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3310839) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Larsen, Wes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hickey et ux v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Terrence Hickey, III
Represented By: Wes Scott Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie L Hickey
Represented By: Wes Scott Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?