Workday, Inc v. Washington State University, et al
Plaintiff: Workday, Inc. and Workday Inc
Defendant: Washington State University and Does 1 - 10
Case Number: 2:2019cv00433
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Workday Inc (Gallina, Asti)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT; re ECF No. #16 Notice of Settlement. All deadlines are VACATED, and any pending motions are DENIED as moot. Case Management Deadline set for 2/13/2020. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (TR, Case Administrator)
January 6, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Cancellation - By Court - Text entry - no PDF document. The motion hearing scheduled 1/6/2020 at 11:00 a.m. in Spokane is CANCELLED.(ES, Courtroom Deputy)
January 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Settlement and Withdrawal of Motions (Joint) by Workday Inc (Gallina, Asti)
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION by Asti Gallina in Support re #14 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Admit Benedict Y. Hur Pro Hac Vice filed by Workday Inc. (Gallina, Asti)
January 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Admit Benedict Y. Hur Pro Hac Vice by Workday Inc. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gallina, Asti)
December 31, 2019 Set/Reset Motion Hearings before Judge Stanley A Bastian as to #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Simona A. Agnolucci; #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Benedict Y. Hur; and #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Joshua D. Anderson. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (CV, Case Administrator)
December 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - By Court - Text entry; no PDF document. Hearing re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order is set for oral argument on 1/6/2020 at 11:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 755 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (CV, Case Administrator)
December 31, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Joshua D. Anderson Re Service of Tambellini Group by Workday Inc. (Reuter, Todd)
December 31, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Workday Inc re Washington State University. (Reuter, Todd)
December 31, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Washington State University. (CV, Case Administrator)
December 31, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (CV, Case Administrator)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Joshua D. Anderson. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3350519. by Workday, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2020 Without Oral Argument before Magistrate Judge J Kelley Arnold. (Reuter, Todd)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Simona A. Agnolucci. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3350517. by Workday, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2020 Without Oral Argument before Magistrate Judge J Kelley Arnold. (Reuter, Todd)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Benedict Y. Hur. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3350508. by Workday, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2020 Without Oral Argument before Magistrate Judge J Kelley Arnold. (Reuter, Todd)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Workday, Inc.. (Reuter, Todd)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION by Peter Schlampp in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Workday, Inc.. (Reuter, Todd)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION by Jim Stratton in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Workday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reuter, Todd)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION by Rick Oleka in Support re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Workday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 & 2)(Reuter, Todd)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Workday, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2020 at 09:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 755 before Magistrate Judge J Kelley Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reuter, Todd)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against Washington State University ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3350486) Filed by Workday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reuter, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Workday, Inc v. Washington State University, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Workday, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Reuter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Workday Inc
Represented By: Diana S Breaux
Represented By: Todd Reuter
Represented By: Asti M Gallina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?