Ray v. Saul
Plaintiff: Nicole Ray
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00003
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Fred Van Sickle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey R McClain on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Jeffrey R McClain added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(McClain, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicole Ray re Andrew M Saul. (Tree, D)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals Plaintiff failed to state how she is covering the gap between her expenses and her income. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Case Management Deadline set for 2/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (TR, Case Administrator)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals the plaintiff failed to state how she is covering the gap between expenses and income. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Case Management Deadline set for 2/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Summons - General Counsel, #2 Summons - US Attorney General)(VR, Courtroom Deputy)
January 2, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul IFP Pending Filed by Nicole Ray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Ray
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Jeffrey R McClain
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?