Johnson et al v. Tamarack Aerospace Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: James Johnson and Bradley Herman
Defendant: Cranfield Aerospace Solutions Limited and Tamarack Aerospace Group Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00062
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading To Complaint by Tamarack Aerospace Group Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Munding, John)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF No. #4 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Bruce A. Lampert, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, is hereby added as counsel for Plaintiffs James Johnson and Bradley Herman. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Bruce Lampert. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3409232. by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Kamitomo, Mark)
February 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance (Bankruptcy Counsel) by John Degnan Munding on behalf of Tamarack Aerospace Group Inc (Attorney John Degnan Munding added to party Tamarack Aerospace Group Inc(pty:dft))(Munding, John)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cranfield Aerospace Solutions Limited, Tamarack Aerospace Group Inc. (AY, Case Administrator)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3396098) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kamitomo, Mark)
February 13, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Tamarack Aerospace Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cranfield Aerospace Solutions Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamarack Aerospace Group Inc
Represented By: John Degnan Munding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Johnson
Represented By: Collin M Harper
Represented By: Mark Douglas Kamitomo
Represented By: Bruce A Lampert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Herman
Represented By: Collin M Harper
Represented By: Mark Douglas Kamitomo
Represented By: Bruce A Lampert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?