Jensen v. American Medical Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rosalie Jensen
Defendant: American Medical Systems Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00072
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. #77 , is GRANTED. Jeffrey L. Haberman is hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Plaintiff's local counsel of record, Kenneth Friedman, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (AY, Case Administrator)
March 25, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - By Court - Text entry;no PDF document. re #61 MOTION to Exclude Garley, Blaivas, Gallaway - MDL ECF 6725, #63 MOTION to Exclude Rosenzweig MDL ECF 6719, #67 MOTION to Exclude Badylak, et al (Plaintiff's) - MDL ECF 7481, #65 MOTION to Exclude Phillips Campbell et al MDL ECF 6711, #62 MOTION to Exclude Guelcher, Mays - MDL ECF 6709, #66 MOTION to Exclude Joslin (Plaintiff's) MDL ECF 6894 : The Court will set the Motion hearing deadlines at the telephonic scheduling conference that is set on 5/5/2020. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Washington State Governor Inslee's Stay Home - Stay Healthy Order dated March 23, 2020, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for March 25, 2020, is continued to May 5, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel should call at least five minutes before the scheduled time using the following: Telephone number: 1-888-636-3807 / Access Code: 8839796. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) (AY, Case Administrator) Modified on 3/25/2020 to add service language. (AY, Case Administrator).
March 24, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J Mullenix on behalf of Rosalie Jensen (Attorney Peter J Mullenix added to party Rosalie Jensen(pty:pla))(Mullenix, Peter)
March 19, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Jeffrey L. Haberman. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3425862. by Rosalie Jensen. Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Friedman, Kenneth)
March 19, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth R Friedman on behalf of Rosalie Jensen (Attorney Kenneth R Friedman added to party Rosalie Jensen(pty:pla))(Friedman, Kenneth)
March 18, 2020 Filing 75 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Medical Systems Inc. (Krashan, Allison)
March 18, 2020 Filing 74 STATUS REPORT JOINT by American Medical Systems Inc. (Talcott, Anne)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 TEXT ORDER: Defendant's Motions For Admission Pro Hac Vice, ECF Nos. #69 , #70 , #71 , #72 , are GRANTED. Barbara R. Binis, Ryan K. Blake, Whitney L. Mayer, and Stephen J. McConnell are hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Defendant's local counsel of record, Anne M. Talcott, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (AY, Case Administrator)
March 13, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Stephen J. McConnell. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3421755. by American Medical Systems Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Talcott, Anne)
March 13, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Whitney L. Mayer. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3421752. by American Medical Systems Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Talcott, Anne)
March 13, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Ryan K. Blake. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3421747. by American Medical Systems Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Talcott, Anne)
March 13, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Barbara R. Binis. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3421738. by American Medical Systems Inc. Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Talcott, Anne)
March 11, 2020 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #62 MOTION to Exclude Guelcher, Mays - MDL ECF 6709 filed by American Medical Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 MDL ECF 7414 Part 2 Pltf Resp Exclude Guelcher ECF 7383, Mays)(Talcott, Anne)
March 11, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION to Exclude Badylak, et al (Plaintiff's) - MDL ECF 7481 by American Medical Systems Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2020 at 02:00 PM via Teleconference before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Talcott, Anne)
March 11, 2020 Filing 66 MOTION to Exclude Joslin (Plaintiff's) MDL ECF 6894 by American Medical Systems Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2020 at 02:00 PM via Teleconference before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 MDL ECF 6894 Plfs Mot Exclude Joslin Part 2, #2 MDL ECF 6894 Plfs Mot Exclude Joslin Part 3, #3 MDL ECF 6895 Plfs Memo iso Exclude Joslin Part 2, #4 MDL ECF 6933 AMS Mot to Strike Mot Exclude Joslin Part 1, #5 MDL ECF 6933 AMS Mot to Strike Mot Exclude Joslin Part 2, #6 MDL ECF 6934 AMS Memo is Mot to Strike, #7 MDL ECF 7031 Pltf Reply Part 1, #8 MDL ECF 7031 Pltf Reply Part 2, #9 MDL ECF 7031 Pltf Reply Part 3, #10 MDL ECF 7031 Pltf Reply Part 4)(Talcott, Anne)
March 11, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION to Exclude Phillips Campbell et al MDL ECF 6711 by American Medical Systems Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2020 at 02:00 PM via Teleconference before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 MDL ECF 6712 Memo iso Omnibus Motion Phillips Campbell et alExclude Guelcher, Mays, #2 MDL ECF 6799 Pltf Resp Exclude Fogelson)(Talcott, Anne)
March 11, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION to Exclude Iakovlev - MDL ECF 6704 by American Medical Systems Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2020 at 02:00 PM via Teleconference before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 MDL ECF 6704 - Motion Iakovlev Part 2, #2 MDL ECF 6705 Brief iso Motion Iakovlev, #3 MDL ECF 6794 Pltf Response Iakovlev Part 1, #4 MDL ECF 6794 Pltf Response Iakovlev Part 2, #5 MDL ECF 6794 Pltf Response Iakovlev Part 3, #6 MDL ECF 6794 Pltf Response Iakovlev Part 4, #7 MDL ECF 6794 Pltf Response Iakovlev Part 5, #8 MDL ECF 6794 Pltf Response Iakovlev Part 6, #9 MDL ECF 6872 AMS Reply Iakovlev, #10 MDL ECF 7405 Notice of Adoption re ECF 6794)(Talcott, Anne)
March 11, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION to Exclude Rosenzweig MDL ECF 6719 by American Medical Systems Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2020 at 02:00 PM via Teleconference before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 MDL ECF 6720 Memo iso Exclude Roswenzweig, #2 MDL ECF 6836 Pltf Resp Exclude Rosenzweig, #3 MDL ECF 6876 AMS Reply Exclude Rosenzwieg, #4 MDL ECF 6896 Pltf Mot SurReply Rosenzweig)(Talcott, Anne)
March 11, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION to Exclude Guelcher, Mays - MDL ECF 6709 by American Medical Systems Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2020 at 02:00 PM via Teleconference before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 MDL ECF 6710 Memo iso Exclude Guelcher, Mays, #2 MDL ECF 6790 Pltf Resp Exclude Guelcher, Mays, #3 MDL ECF 6868 AMS Reply Exclude Guelcher, Mays)(Talcott, Anne)
March 11, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION to Exclude Garley, Blaivas, Gallaway - MDL ECF 6725 by American Medical Systems Inc. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2020 at 02:00 PM via Teleconference before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 MDL ECF 6726 Memo iso Exclude Garley, Blaivas, Galloway, #2 MDL ECF 6787 Pltf Response Garley, Blaivas, Galloway, #3 MDL 6789 - PLT Memo iso Resp Garley et al)(Talcott, Anne)
March 11, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE by American Medical Systems Inc MDL ECF 1234 - Pretrial Order #171 - Order Amending Pretrial Order #118 (Talcott, Anne)
March 11, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE by American Medical Systems Inc MDL ECF 748 - Pretrial Order #73 Stipulation - Defense Witnesses (Talcott, Anne)
March 11, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE by American Medical Systems Inc MDL ECF 288 Pretrial Order #17 (Talcott, Anne)
March 11, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE by American Medical Systems Inc MDL ECF 231 Pretrial Order #13 Stip Prot Order (Talcott, Anne)
March 11, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Kathleen Krashan on behalf of American Medical Systems Inc (Attorney Allison Kathleen Krashan added to party American Medical Systems Inc(pty:dft))(Krashan, Allison)
March 11, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance Anne M. Talcott by Anne M Talcott on behalf of American Medical Systems Inc (Attorney Anne M Talcott added to party American Medical Systems Inc(pty:dft))(Talcott, Anne)
February 28, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 3/25/2020 at 02:00 PM via Teleconference. PHONE NUMBER: 1-888-636-3807, ACCESS CODE: 8839796, SECURITY CODE: None required. (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (AY, Case Administrator)
February 20, 2020 Filing 53 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:13-cv-16379. Docket sheet received.
February 19, 2020 Filing 52 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02325 - American Medical Systems, Inc. (Binis, Barbara) (Modified on 2/20/2020 to add party filer)(mk). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 2/20/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 2/19/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 02/06/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER directing the Clerk to replace ECF No. 40-1 (Exhibit A and Exhibit C (Parts 1 and 2) only)), in this civil action with exhibits 7559-1, 7559-2, and 7559-3 filed in AMS 2325. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/24/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 49 BRIEF by American Medical Systems, Inc. in support of #40 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Exclude The Specific Causation Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703. (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER directing the Clerk to file the Memoranda of Law listed herein in each individual case and link it to the appropriate Daubert motions. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/24/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 47 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Rosalie Jensen of Matthew J. Fagan M.D., M.S. on December 19, 2018 at 4:00 PM EST (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 46 RESPONSE by American Medical Systems, Inc. in opposition to #45 Notice of Videotaped Deposition by Rosalie Jensen of Matthew J. Fagan MD, MS (Binis, Barbara) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Rosalie Jensen of Matthew J. Fagan MD, MS on December 19, 2018 at 3:00 PM EST (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 44 OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES by American Medical Systems, Inc. to #43 Notice of Videotaped Deposition. (Binis, Barbara) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
November 15, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Rosalie Jensen of James Coad, MD on November 20, 2018 at 9:00 AM EST (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 42 REPLY BRIEF by American Medical Systems, Inc. to #41 Response in Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits A-I) (originally filed in MDL 2325 at ECF No. 6877 on 11/01/2018) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 41 RESPONSE by Certain Plaintiffs in opposition to #40 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Exclude The Specific Causation Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703. (Attachment: #1 Exhibits) (originally filed in MDL 2325 at ECF No. 6873 on 11/01/2018) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Exclude The Specific Causation Opinions and Testimony of Bruce Rosenzweig, M.D., Pursuant to Daubert and Federal Rules of Evidence 702 and 703. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E, #2 Exhibits F-H, #3 Exhibits I-L, #4 Exhibits M-Q, #5 Exhibits R-U, #6 Exhibit V1, #7 Exhibit V2, #8 Exhibit V3, #9 Proposed Order)(originally docketed in MDL 2325 on 10/18/2018 at ECF #6722) (mms) (Modified on 1/24/2020 to remove attachment #1 and replace with redacted version pursuant to the #50 order) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 39 REPLY by American Medical Systems, Inc. to Plaintiff's #38 Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Binis, Barbara) Modified on 11/13/2018 to correct link to #38 response in opposition)(rmc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 38 RESPONSE by Rosalie Jensen in opposition to #35 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 37 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig on October 30, 2018 and October 31, 2018 at 9:00 AM each day. (Binis, Barbara) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by American Medical Systems, Inc. in support of #35 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. for Summary Judgment on Failure to Warn Claim (Binis, Barbara) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION by American Medical Systems, Inc. for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Ex. A-D, #2 Proposed Order)(Binis, Barbara) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig on October 17, 2018 at 9:00 AM. (Binis, Barbara) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rosalie Jensen for Amended Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
July 13, 2018 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rosalie Jensen for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rosalie Jensen for Responses to Defendants' Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PRETRIAL ORDER # 255 (Amended Docket Control Order American Medical Systems Inc. Wave 3 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 249. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 3 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; AMS Wave 3 Cases) (kab) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Directing that the parties in the cases identified on the attached Exhibit A appear for a continuation of the Mandatory Settlement Conference on 6/15/2018 at 9:00 a.m. in Charleston, West Virginia; the court expects the presence of plaintiffs, plaintiffs' counsel of record, and counsel of record for defendant American Medical Systems, Inc., at the conference. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/11/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rosalie Jensen for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
May 26, 2018 Filing 27 PLAINTIFF'S CROSS-NOTICE OF AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Rosalie Jensen of Renee Woods, MD on May 29, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
May 26, 2018 Filing 26 PLAINTIFF'S CROSS-NOTICE OF AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Rosalie Jensen of Linda Partoll, MD on May 30, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 MOTION by Rosalie Jensen to Change the Mediation Date re: #19 Pretrial Order #253. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/25/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION by Rosalie Jensen to Change the Mediation Date re: #19 Pretrial Order #253 (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 23 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Renee Woods, M.D. on May 29, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. (Binis, Barbara) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 22 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Linda Partoll, M.D. on May 30, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. (Binis, Barbara) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Renee Woods, M.D. on May 29, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. (Binis, Barbara) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by American Medical Systems, Inc. of Linda Partoll, M.D. on May 30, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. (Binis, Barbara) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL ORDER #253 (Order Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference for Certain Unresolved Cases) Directing that the settlement conferences will be conducted as follows: 1. For the cases identified on Exhibit A, the court will conduct a mandatory settlement conference in those cases beginning on 6/6/2018 at 9:00 a.m. in room 5600B and continuing from day-to-day thereafter. 2. For the cases identified on Exhibit B, the court will conduct a mandatory settlement conference in those cases beginning on 6/7/2018 at 9:00 a.m. in room 5600B and continuing from day-to-day thereafter. 3. For the cases identified on Exhibit C, the court will conduct a mandatory settlement conference in those cases beginning on 6/8/2018 at 9:00 a.m. in room 5600B and continuing from day-to-day thereafter. Further directing that (1) individual plaintiffs whose cases are scheduled for a settlement conference shall appear in person for the settlement conference with counsel of record as reflected on the docket sheet for that plaintiff's case; and (2) any plaintiff who fails to comply with this PTO may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice. If the parties reach a settlement in a case listed on Exhibits A, B or C, submission of an inactive docket order for that case will relieve plaintiff and her counsel from the obligation of attending the mandatory settlement conference. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/22/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases Listed on Exhibits A, B & C) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rosalie Jensen for Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 17 CROSS-NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Rosalie Jensen of Rosalie Jensen on May 3, 2018 at 3:00 pm (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David Silverman on behalf of Rosalie Jensen. (Silverman, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA to Linda Partoll, MD by American Medical Systems, Inc. (Binis, Barbara) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL ORDER # 251 (Order Re: Mandatory Settlement Conference for Certain Unresolved Cases) It is ORDERED that: 1. Counsel for plaintiffs, identified on the attached Exhibit A, who have alleged claims against American Medical Systems, Inc. or Astora Women's Health, LLC and whose cases have not been resolved and are not subject to an agreement in principle to resolve, are directed to meet and confer with Reisman Karron Greene LLP, settlement counsel for AMS, on or before 5/14/2018 and to engage in good faith discussions about the possibility of settlement. Counsel may also contact Bryan Aylstock, Henry Garrard, or Fred Thompson, coordinating co-lead counsel for plaintiffs, regarding coordination of settlement discussions with AMS. 2. Counsel Reisman, Aylstock, Garrard, and Thompson are directed to provide a joint written report to the court via email on 5/18/2018 identifying which cases remaining on Exhibit A, if any, have not been resolved or dismissed. 3. In all cases that have not been resolved or dismissed by 5/18/2018, the court will conduct settlement conferences in Charleston, West Virginia at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse, Room 7009 beginning at 9:00 a.m. on 6/4/2018, and continuing from day-to-day thereafter. Parties should come prepared for evening work. 4. The court will enter an order on 5/22/2018 identifying the cases wherein a settlement conference will be conducted. 5. Individual plaintiffs whose cases are scheduled for a settlement conference shall appear in person for the settlement conference with counsel. 6. Any plaintiff who fails to comply with this PTO may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice. 7. Cases not settled during the settlement conference will be dealt with by further order. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/19/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (pma) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Rosalie Jensen of Linda Partoll, M.D. on 05/22/18 at 9:00 a.m. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
February 9, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Rosalie Jensen of Renee L. Woods, M.D. on 05/21/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL ORDER # 249 (Docket Control Order - American Medical Systems Inc. Wave 3 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 3 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any case(s) in the American Medical Systems, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 case is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 case is incorporated in the American Medical Systems, Inc., Wave 3 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 3 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 3 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; AMS Wave 3 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 20, 2017 Filing 10 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Rosalie Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 20, 2017 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Rosalie Jensen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER # 223 (Order re: Production of Case-Specific Information For Certain AMS MDL Plaintiffs) It is directed as follows: A) Existing Cases pending as of October 10, 2016. This order applies to certain cases in MDL 2325 alleging claim(s) against AMS, as of 10/10/2016, and listed on Exhibit A. B) Plaintiff Fact Sheets, Authorizations and Documents. Plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A shall submit a full and complete PFS with verifications and the attached authorizations and the other documents identified herein to the individuals identified in Paragraph C by 11/21/2016, as more fully set forth herein. D) This PTO does not in any way relieve plaintiffs from their obligation to serve a Plaintiff Profile Form; and E) Any plaintiff who fails to comply with this PTO may be subject to a substantial sanction, including dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/21/2016. (cc: Clerk of JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2325; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
January 29, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jeffrey L. Haberman on behalf of Rosalie Jensen. (Haberman, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
August 5, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael J. Farrell on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Farrell, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
August 5, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Erik W. Legg on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Legg, Erik) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
July 2, 2013 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for American Medical Systems, Inc.. American Medical Systems, Inc. served on 7/2/2013, answer due 7/23/2013. Summons served on Melanie McGrath as Process Agent. (Patrick, Charles) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
July 2, 2013 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER #71 (Bellwether Case Selections) entered on 07/01/2013 in MDL 2325 to attorneys in member case. (jap) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
July 1, 2013 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Medical Systems, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]
June 28, 2013 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2508905. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mlh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jensen v. American Medical Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems Inc
Represented By: Barbara R. Binis
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Represented By: Michael J Farrell
Represented By: Ryan K Blake
Represented By: Stephen J McConnell
Represented By: Whitney L Mayer
Represented By: Allison Kathleen Krashan
Represented By: Anne M Talcott
Represented By: Erik W Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Jensen
Represented By: David Silverman
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Haberman
Represented By: Charles Bland Patrick
Represented By: Kenneth R Friedman
Represented By: Peter J Mullenix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?