Beveridge et al v. City of Spokane et al
Plaintiff: Shaun Beveridge, Reed Alefteras and Robert Elder
Defendant: Lonny Tofsrud, Craig N Meidl, Dean Sprague, City of Spokane Police Department, City of Spokane and John and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2020cv00098
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing of Non-Scannable Exhibits with the Clerk. The following non-scannable exhibits have been filed with the Clerk: Body Cam video CD re #17 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, by All Plaintiffs Type of application required to view or listen to digital media: Windows media player (Phelps, Douglas)
May 8, 2020 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT by Reed Alefteras in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Phelps, Douglas)
May 8, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT by Robert Elder in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Phelps, Douglas)
May 8, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT by Shaun Beveridge in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by All Plaintiffs. (Phelps, Douglas)
May 8, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION by Douglas D. Phelps in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Phelps, Douglas)
May 8, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by All Plaintiffs. (Phelps, Douglas)
April 20, 2020 Filing 15 Plaintiffs' ANSWER to Counterclaim on Malicious Prosecution by All Plaintiffs.(Phelps, Douglas)
April 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by City of Spokane, City of Spokane Police Department, Craig N Meidl, Dean Sprague, Lonny Tofsrud. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defs' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Estes, Stewart)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER ONLY (no PDF will issue) granting, for good cause shown, Defendants' Motion for Overlength Brief, ECF No. #7 . Defendants may file a 28-page motion for judgment on the pleadings pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c); Plaintiffs may file a 28-page response; and Defendants may file a 14-page reply. In response to the Motion for Overlength Brief, Plaintiffs requested that they be given additional time to respond to an overlength brief, should the Court allow Defendants to submit one. However, as Defendants have not yet filed their motion for judgment on the pleadings, Plaintiffs' request for an extension of time is premature. The Court will consider a motion to continue briefing deadlines after the relevant motion is filed and a hearing date is set. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
April 16, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #7 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re: Defs' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by City of Spokane, City of Spokane Police Department, Craig N Meidl, Dean Sprague, Lonny Tofsrud. (Estes, Stewart)
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re: Defs' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A.1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A.2)(Phelps, Douglas)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER ONLY (no PDF will issue) On April 14, 2020, the Court granted Defendants' Motion to Expedite, ECF No. #6 , and reset the hearing for Defendants' Motion to File Excess Pages, ECF No. #7 , to April 20, 2020. Plaintiffs were directed to file any response to the Motion to File Excess Pages, ECF No. #7 , no later than April 17, 2020. On April 15, 2020, Plaintiffs filed a response to the Motion to Expedite, ECF No. #6 , rather than the Motion for Excess Pages, ECF No. #7 . The Court already has found good cause to expedite hearing on the Motion to File Excess Pages and has set an expedited briefing schedule. See ECF No. 8 . However, in light of Plaintiffs' recent filing, the Court will extend Plaintiffs' time to respond to the Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file any response to Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, ECF No. #7 , by April 19, 2020. Any reply shall be filed by 3:00 p.m. on April 20, 2020. The hearing date for Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, ECF No. #7 , remains set for April 20, 2020, without oral argument. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Expedite Hearing Re: Defs' Motion for Overlength Brief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A.1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A.2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Phelps, Douglas)
April 15, 2020 Set/Reset Motion Hearing as to ECF No. #7 , MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re: Defs' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Motion Hearing reset for 4/20/2020 without oral argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. See ECF No. 8 (MS, Judicial Assistant)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER ONLY (no PDF will issue) granting, for good cause shown, Defendants' Motion to Expedite, ECF No. [6.] Plaintiffs shall file any response to Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, ECF No. #7 , by April 17, 2020. Defendants shall file any reply no later than 3:00 p.m. on April 20, 2020. Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, ECF No. [7,] is RESET to April 20, 2020, without oral argument. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re: Defs' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by City of Spokane, City of Spokane Police Department, Craig N Meidl, Dean Sprague, Lonny Tofsrud. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defs' Overlength Brief)(Estes, Stewart)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite Hearing Re: Defs' Motion for Overlength Brief by City of Spokane, City of Spokane Police Department, Craig N Meidl, Dean Sprague, Lonny Tofsrud. Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defs' Motion for Expedited Hearing)(Estes, Stewart)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/29/2020, at 10:00 AMbefore Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. , COUNTERCLAIM FOR MALICIOUS PROSECUTION against Reed Alefteras, Shaun Beveridge, Robert Elder by Craig N Meidl, City of Spokane, City of Spokane Police Department, Dean Sprague, Lonny Tofsrud.(Estes, Stewart)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Stewart A. Estes Verification of Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal, by City of Spokane, City of Spokane Police Department, Craig N Meidl, Dean Sprague, Lonny Tofsrud. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Estes, Stewart)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Salvatore J Faggiano on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Salvatore J Faggiano added to party City of Spokane(pty:dft), Attorney Salvatore J Faggiano added to party City of Spokane Police Department(pty:dft), Attorney Salvatore J Faggiano added to party John and Jane Does 1-10(pty:dft), Attorney Salvatore J Faggiano added to party Craig N Meidl(pty:dft), Attorney Salvatore J Faggiano added to party Dean Sprague(pty:dft), Attorney Salvatore J Faggiano added to party Lonny Tofsrud(pty:dft))(Faggiano, Salvatore)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3419653 Filed by Craig N Meidl, City of Spokane, City of Spokane Police Department, Dean Sprague, Lonny Tofsrud. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Estes, Stewart)
March 11, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beveridge et al v. City of Spokane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Beveridge
Represented By: Douglas Dwight Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reed Alefteras
Represented By: Douglas Dwight Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Elder
Represented By: Douglas Dwight Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonny Tofsrud
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: Salvatore J Faggiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig N Meidl
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: Salvatore J Faggiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Sprague
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: Salvatore J Faggiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Spokane Police Department
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: Salvatore J Faggiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Spokane
Represented By: Stewart Andrew Estes
Represented By: Salvatore J Faggiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Represented By: Salvatore J Faggiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?