Pacific Towing & Recovery Services LLC v. United Financial Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Pacific Towing & Recovery Services LLC
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00125
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Financial Casualty Company. (Lether, Thomas)
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/23/2020 at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by United Financial Casualty Company Re #1 Notice of Removal. Description: To supplement Notice of Removal with Summons and Case Assignment (Exhibits C and D). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Lether, Thomas)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by United Financial Casualty Company.(Neal, Eric)
March 27, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (CLP, Case Administrator)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3431172 Filed by United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Lether, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Towing & Recovery Services LLC v. United Financial Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Towing & Recovery Services LLC
Represented By: James M Bulthuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Company
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?