Strong v. Bartells Asbestos Settlement Trust et al
Plaintiff: Kristina T Strong
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc, Genuine Parts Company, Thrifty Mobile Home & Auto Sales, Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, Bartells Asbestos Settlement Trust and Thrifty Mobile Home & Auto Sales Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00136
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 First MOTION to Clarify Citizenship of Removing Defendant Pneumo Abex filed by Genuine Parts Company, Honeywell International Inc, Pneumo Abex LLC. (Ricketts, Michael)
May 7, 2020 Filing 15 Amended RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - Second Amended by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Ricketts, Michael)
May 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John L Steffan on behalf of Kristina T Strong (Steffan, John)
May 1, 2020 Filing 13 Amended RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Ricketts, Michael)
April 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC. Attorney James E. Horne is withdrawing. Michael Edward Ricketts is substituted as counsel for Defendant. (Attorney Michael Edward Ricketts added to party Pneumo Abex LLC(pty:dft))(Ricketts, Michael)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF No #9 , Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney John L. Steffan, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, is hereby added as counsel for Plaintiff Kristina T. Strong. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail. Document to be mailed on on April 29, 2020, due to COVID-19 restrictions).
April 28, 2020 Filing 10 JURY DEMAND NOTICE by Kristina T Strong (Good, Meredith) Modified on 4/28/2020 docket text to reflect correct title of document (CV, Case Administrator).
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Viceof Meredith Good re Attorney: John L. Steffan. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3448263. by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Good, Meredith)
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION to Clarify Citizenship of Removing Defendant Pneumo Abex by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Good, Meredith)
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) by All Plaintiffs (Good, Meredith)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Meredith Good by Meredith Good on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Good, Meredith)
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Horne, James)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Honeywell International Inc. (Kruger, Kristine)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Genuine Parts Company. (Hanson, Lorianne)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Lorianne Hanson re #1 Notice of Removal by Genuine Parts Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Appendix)(Hanson, Lorianne)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3433491 Filed by Pneumo Abex LLC, Genuine Parts Company, Honeywell International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hanson, Lorianne)
April 1, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strong v. Bartells Asbestos Settlement Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina T Strong
Represented By: Kelly Battley
Represented By: Meredith Good
Represented By: John L Steffan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc
Represented By: Kristine Elizabeth Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Jeanne F Loftis
Represented By: Lorianne Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrifty Mobile Home & Auto Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: James Edward Horne
Represented By: Diane J Kero
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bartells Asbestos Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrifty Mobile Home & Auto Sales Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?