Walker v. Uttecht et al
Defendant: State of Washington
Petitioner: Michael Walker
Respondent: Jeffrey Uttecht
Case Number: 2:2020cv00204
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO COMPLY WITH FILING FEE OR IN FORMA PAUPERIS REQUIREMENTS (Petitioner must either pay the full filing fee or comply with the in forma pauperis statute.) Filing Fee due by 8/26/2020. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application Form)(VR, Courtroom Deputy) **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Michael Walker, Prisoner ID: 415920)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE RE: Unsigned Filing. Pursuant to Rule 11, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, you must sign each document you present to the Court. Please sign and return the signature page only of the Petition. Also, before your case can be reviewed by the Court, we must receive the completed Certificate section of your Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. The Certificate section must be completed by an Authorized Officer of the prison. In the alternative, you may pay the $5.00 filing fee. Upon receipt of your signed signature page and completed Certificate section or the $5.00 filing fee, your case will be forwarded to the Court for review. This is a text notice only. (AN, Courtroom Deputy) **TEXT ONLY ENTRY, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Michael Walker, Prisoner ID: 415920)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (Attachments: #1 IFP Certificate) (AN, Courtroom Deputy) ** PRINT ALL** (Michael Walker, Prisoner ID: 415920)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5 Receipt #IFP Pending.) Filed by Michael Walker.(AN, Courtroom Deputy) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Michael Walker, Prisoner ID: 415920)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Uttecht et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Uttecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?