Universal Funding Corporation v. Stockwell Harris Woolverton Helphrey et al
Plaintiff: Universal Funding Corporation
Defendant: George Woolverton, Stockwell Harris Woolverton Helphrey and Steven I Harris
Case Number: 2:2020cv00205
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 26 Joint Certificate Pursuant to Rule 26 / Rule 16 by Universal Funding Corporation. (Muchinsky, Brian)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF shall issue) GRANTING Defendants' Stipulated Motion to Strike, ECF No. #19 , Defendants' first Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively, to Stay, or Alternatively, to Transfer, ECF No. #8 , based on Plaintiff's filing of the First Amended Complaint, ECF No. #13 , and Defendants' filing of a second Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively, to Stay, or Alternatively, to Transfer, ECF No. #20 . Defendants' first Motion to Dismiss, or Alternatively, to Stay, or Alternatively, to Transfer, ECF No. #8 , shall be stricken. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on this matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Courtroom Deputy)
July 14, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by Stockwell Harris Woolverton Helphrey, George Woolverton re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, to Stay, or in the Alternative, to Transfer (Request for Judicial Notice) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C to RJN, pp 5-55, #2 Exhibit E to RJN, pp 56-58, #3 Exhibit F to RJN, pp 59-64, #4 Exhibit G to RJN, pp 65-67, #5 Exhibit H to RJN, pp 68-69, #6 Exhibit I to RJN, pp 70-71, #7 Exhibit J to RJN, pp 72-74, #8 Exhibit L to RJN, pp 75-107)(Nelson, Susan)
July 14, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION by Jeffrey M. Cohon in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, to Stay, or in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by Stockwell Harris Woolverton Helphrey, George Woolverton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K to Dec of Cohon pp 7-8, #2 Exhibit M to Dec of Cohon pp 9-22)(Nelson, Susan)
July 14, 2020 Filing 22 DECLARATION by George Woolverton in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, to Stay, or in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by Stockwell Harris Woolverton Helphrey, George Woolverton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D to Dec of Woolverton, pp 10-22)(Nelson, Susan)
July 14, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION by Peter Salomon in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, to Stay, or in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by Stockwell Harris Woolverton Helphrey, George Woolverton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Dec of Salomon, pp 5-6, #2 Exhibit B to Dec of Salomon, pp 7-8)(Nelson, Susan)
July 14, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, to Stay, or in the Alternative, to Transfer by Stockwell Harris Woolverton Helphrey, George Woolverton. Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 901 before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Nelson, Susan)
July 13, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Strike #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or Alternatively to Stay by Stockwell Harris Woolverton Helphrey, George Woolverton. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Strike)(Nelson, Susan)
July 7, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION by Brian M. Muchinsky in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or Alternatively to Stay filed by Universal Funding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, pp. 6-7, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, pp. 8-10, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, pp. 11-14, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, pp. 15-47, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, pp. 48-52, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, pp. 53-61, #7 Exhibit Ex. G, pp. 62-63, #8 Exhibit Ex. H, pp. 64-78)(Muchinsky, Brian)
July 7, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION by Kyle Bergstedt in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or Alternatively to Stay filed by Universal Funding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, pp. 7-9, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, pp. 10-11, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, pp. 12-13, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, pp. 14-25, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, pp 26-32, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, pp 33-39, #7 Exhibit Ex. G, pp. 40-41, #8 Exhibit Ex. H, pp. 42-43, #9 Exhibit Ex. I, pp. 44-53, #10 Exhibit Ex. J, pp. 54-56, #11 Exhibit Ex. K., pp. 57-58, #12 Exhibit Ex. L., pp. 59-60)(Muchinsky, Brian)
July 7, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or Alternatively to Stay filed by Universal Funding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order RE Motion to Dismiss)(Muchinsky, Brian)
July 7, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or Alternatively to Stay filed by Universal Funding Corporation. (Muchinsky, Brian)
July 6, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Steven I Harris. (CLP, Case Administrator)
June 30, 2020 Filing 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Stockwell Harris Woolverton Helphrey, George Woolverton, Steven I. Harris. Filed by Universal Funding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Steven I. Harris)(Muchinsky, Brian)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by All Defendants re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or Alternatively to Stay (Request for Judicial Notice) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C to RJN, pp 5-55, #2 Exhibit E to RJN, pp 56-58, #3 Exhibit F to RJN, pp 59-64, #4 Exhibit G to RJN, pp 65-67, #5 Exhibit H to RJN, pp 68-69, #6 Exhibit I to RJN, pp 70-71, #7 Exhibit J to RJN, pp 72-74, #8 Exhibit L to RJN, pp 75-107)(Nelson, Susan)
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION by Jeffrey M. Cohon in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or Alternatively to Stay filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K to Dec of Cohon pp 7-8, #2 Exhibit M to Dec of Cohon pp 9-22)(Nelson, Susan)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION by Peter Salomon in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or Alternatively to Stay filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Dec of Salomon, pp 5-6, #2 Exhibit B to Dec of Salomon, pp 7-8)(Nelson, Susan)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION by George Woolverton in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or Alternatively to Stay filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D to Dec of Woolverton, pp 10-22)(Nelson, Susan)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or Alternatively to Stay by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2020 at 01:30 PM in Spokane Courtroom 901 before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motin to Dismiss)(Nelson, Susan)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 State Court Documents received filed by All Defendants . (Attachments: #1 Appendix State Court Records)(Nelson, Susan)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 Report on the filing or determination of an action involving a trademark. (CLP, Case Administrator)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Universal Funding Corporation. (Muchinsky, Brian)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Stockwell Harris Woolverton Helphrey, George Woolverton to Plaintiff of Removal (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Nelson, Susan)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stockwell Harris Woolverton Helphrey. (Nelson, Susan)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A Dunn on behalf of Stockwell Harris Woolverton Helphrey, George Woolverton (Attorney Robert A Dunn added to party Stockwell Harris Woolverton Helphrey(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Dunn added to party George Woolverton(pty:dft))(Dunn, Robert)
June 2, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (CLP, Case Administrator)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3471047 Filed by George Woolverton, Stockwell, Harris, Woolverton & Helphrey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Sup. Ct Summon & Complaint)(Nelson, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Universal Funding Corporation v. Stockwell Harris Woolverton Helphrey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Funding Corporation
Represented By: Brian M Muchinsky
Represented By: Brent Jordon Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Woolverton
Represented By: Susan C Nelson
Represented By: Robert A Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stockwell Harris Woolverton Helphrey
Represented By: Susan C Nelson
Represented By: Robert A Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven I Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?