Hendrickson v. Inslee et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Kay Hendrickson
Defendant: Secretary of Health Wiesman John, Governor Jay Inslee, John Wiesman and Jay Inslee
Case Number: 2:2020cv00246
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey C. Grant on behalf of Jay Inslee, John Wiesman (Attorney Jeffrey C. Grant added to party Jay Inslee(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey C. Grant added to party John Wiesman(pty:dft))(Grant, Jeffrey)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan C Selby on behalf of Jay Inslee, John Wiesman (Attorney Brendan C Selby added to party Jay Inslee(pty:dft), Attorney Brendan C Selby added to party John Wiesman(pty:dft))(Selby, Brendan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Todd Even on behalf of Jay Inslee, John Wiesman (Attorney Jeffrey Todd Even added to party Jay Inslee(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Todd Even added to party John Wiesman(pty:dft))(Even, Jeffrey)
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary P Jones on behalf of Jay Inslee, John Wiesman (Attorney Zachary P Jones added to party Jay Inslee(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary P Jones added to party John Wiesman(pty:dft))(Jones, Zachary)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Jay Inslee and John Wiesman. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals lack of information. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Case Management Deadline set for 8/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFICIENT FILING re Civil Complaint Filing Fee. Filing Fee due by 7/24/2020. (AY, Case Administrator)
July 9, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Brenda Kay Hendrickson against Jay Inslee IFP Pending Jury Demand. Filed by Brenda Kay Hendrickson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Carr, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendrickson v. Inslee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Health Wiesman John
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Jay Inslee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wiesman
Represented By: Brendan C Selby
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Grant
Represented By: Zachary Pekelis Jones
Represented By: Jeffrey Todd Even
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Inslee
Represented By: Brendan C Selby
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Grant
Represented By: Zachary Pekelis Jones
Represented By: Jeffrey Todd Even
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Kay Hendrickson
Represented By: Jeffrey M Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?