Young v. Ferguson
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Defendant: Bob Ferguson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00277
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 COMPLAINT filed by Huguette Nicole Young. Objections to R&R due by 9/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (LTR, Case Administrator)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION 1. To remove magistrate judge from the case; 2) have the DJ render an order on Application to Proceed IFP; and 3) compel the court to honor Rule 5.1(b) of Fed. R. Civ. P. by Huguette Nicole Young. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Young v Superior Court of CA, Petition for Review, #2 Exhibit Number of Magistrate Judges in the US, #3 Exhibit Dred Scott Fraud, Challenge to 16th Amendment)(Young, Huguette)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 Pro se litigant Huguette Nicole Young has registered to file and receive service of documents and notice of electronic filings to hn_young@yahoo.com via ECF. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. (JW, ECF Admin)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 MOTION FOR CM/ECF LOGIN AND PASSWORD. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (LTR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Obtain ECF Login and Password by Huguette Nicole Young. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope)(LTR, Case Administrator)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary P Jones on behalf of Bob Ferguson (Attorney Zachary P Jones added to party Bob Ferguson(pty:dft))(Jones, Zachary)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Todd Even on behalf of Bob Ferguson (Attorney Jeffrey Todd Even added to party Bob Ferguson(pty:dft))(Even, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals Plaintiff provided no financial information. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Case Management Deadline set for 9/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (LTR, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 Constitutional Challenge Certification. A copy of this certification has been mailed to the Washington Attorney General. NO JUDGMENT HOLDING STATUTE UNCONSTITUTIONAL MAY ENTER UNTIL AFTER ATTORNEY GENERAL INTERVENES OR 60 DAY DEADLINE FOR INTERVENTION LAPSES. Follow Up on 10/9/2020. (LTR, Case Administrator)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bob Ferguson (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # IFP Pending) Filed by Huguette Nicole Young. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LTR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Ferguson
Represented By: Jeffrey Todd Even
Represented By: Zachary Pekelis Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huguette Nicole Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?