Sowers v. Saul
Plaintiff: Shawn Sowers
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00296
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John T Rodgers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Eric Staples on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Jeffrey Eric Staples added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Staples, Jeffrey)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Shawn Sowers Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Shawn Sowers(pty:pla))(Durkin, Timothy) Modified on 8/26/2020 docket text to correct represented party(AN, Courtroom Deputy).
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Sowers re Andrew M Saul. (Brandt, Cory)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued to General Counsel, Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney General) as to Andrew M Saul.(AY, Case Administrator)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by 08/31/2020. Case Management Deadline set for 8/31/2020. (AY, Case Administrator)
August 19, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul IFP Pending Filed by Shawn Sowers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Brandt, Cory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sowers v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Sowers
Represented By: Cory J Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Represented By: Jeffrey Eric Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?