Wiker v. USAA Casualty Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Steven F Wiker
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Co and United Services Automobile Association
Case Number: 2:2020cv00332
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All Defendants. (Vacha, Jason)
October 27, 2020 Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason E Vacha on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Jason E Vacha added to party USAA Casualty Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Jason E Vacha added to party United Services Automobile Association(pty:dft))(Vacha, Jason)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued in blank. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(AY, Case Administrator)
September 17, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3564551) Jury Demand. Filed by Steven F Wiker. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Best, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiker v. USAA Casualty Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven F Wiker
Represented By: Jacob A Mark
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Best
Represented By: Michael Raymond Merkelbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Co
Represented By: Jason E Vacha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: Jason E Vacha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?