Faire et al v. Okanogan County et al
Plaintiff: James Faire and Angela Faire
Defendant: Kreg Sloan, Branden Platter, Karl Sloan, Frank Rogers and Okanogan County
Case Number: 2:2020cv00337
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 1/20/2022 at 11:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 755. Jury Trial set for 1/31/2022 at 09:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 755. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LTR, Case Administrator)
October 23, 2020 Filing 33 Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian : Scheduling Conference held on 10/23/2020. (Reported/Recorded by: None) (JLK, Courtroom Deputy)
October 8, 2020 Filing 32 Joint Certificate Pursuant to Rule 26 / Rule 16 signed by all parties by All Plaintiffs. (Beggs, Breean)
September 28, 2020 Filing 31 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2020 at 10:30 AM via Teleconference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
September 18, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (CV, Case Administrator)
September 18, 2020 Filing 30 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:20-cv-00946. Docket sheet received.
September 11, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Branden Platter, Karl Sloan.(Baker, Brian) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting Defendants' #16 Motion to Change Venue. The Clerk is directed to TRANSFER this action to the Eastern District of Washington, effective fourteen (14) days after the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Okanogan County, Frank Rogers, Kreg Sloan.(Kirkpatrick, Paul) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
August 21, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY, filed by Defendants Okanogan County, Branden Platter, Frank Rogers, Karl Sloan, Kreg Sloan, TO RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Change Venue (Kirkpatrick, Paul) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Angela Nobilis Faire filed by Plaintiffs Angela Faire, James Faire re #16 MOTION to Change Venue (Beggs, Breean) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Mary Elizabeth Dillon filed by Plaintiffs Angela Faire, James Faire re #16 MOTION to Change Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K)(Beggs, Breean) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Angela Faire, James Faire, to #16 MOTION to Change Venue . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beggs, Breean) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 22 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 8. (Beggs, Breean) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 21 EXHIBIT 1 re #17 Declaration by Defendants Okanogan County, Frank Rogers, Kreg Sloan (Kirkpatrick, Paul) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Noting Date Set/Reset re #16 MOTION to Change Venue: Noting Date 8/28/2020 (MW) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #19 Praecipe to Attach Document (Kirkpatrick, Paul) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 19 PRAECIPE to attach document re #16 MOTION to Change Venue by Defendants Okanogan County, Branden Platter, Frank Rogers, Karl Sloan, Kreg Sloan (Kirkpatrick, Paul) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Tanya Craig filed by Defendants Okanogan County, Frank Rogers, Kreg Sloan re #16 MOTION to Change Venue (Kirkpatrick, Paul) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Counsel filed by Defendants Okanogan County, Frank Rogers, Kreg Sloan re #16 MOTION to Change Venue (Kirkpatrick, Paul) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Change Venue (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/28/2020 8/21/2020, (Kirkpatrick, Paul) Modified on 8/4/2020 (MW). [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Karl Sloan mailed on 7/15/2020 6/24/2020 (Baker, Brian) Modified on 7/22/2020 (MW). [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Branden Platter mailed on 7/15/2020 6/24/2020 (Baker, Brian) Modified on 7/22/2020 (MW). [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian J Baker on behalf of Defendants Branden Platter, Karl Sloan. (Baker, Brian) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Mary Elizabeth Dillon on behalf of Plaintiffs Angela Faire, James Faire. (Dillon, Mary) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Frank Rogers mailed on 7/6/2020 (Kirkpatrick, Paul) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons (Kreg Sloan mailed on 7/2/2020) (Kirkpatrick, Paul) Modified on 7/6/2020 (MW). [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
July 6, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #8 Waiver of Service
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Okanogan County mailed on 7/2/2020 (Kirkpatrick, Paul) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Kreg Sloan mailed on 7/2/2020 (Kirkpatrick, Paul) Modified on 7/6/2020 to strike per phone request from counsel. Corrected document to be refiled (PM). [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Christopher C Browning on behalf of Defendants Okanogan County, Frank Rogers, Kreg Sloan. (Browning, Christopher) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/31/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/17/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/31/2020, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul L Kirkpatrick on behalf of Defendants Okanogan County, Frank Rogers, Kreg Sloan. (Kirkpatrick, Paul) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs Angela Faire, James Faire (Beggs, Breean) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
June 22, 2020 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR VIOLATION OF FEDERAL CIVIL RIGHTS, AND MALICIOUS PROSECUTION against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6413892), filed by James Faire, Angela Faire. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Okanogan Co., #3 Summons - Karl Sloan, #4 Summons - Kreg Sloan, #5 Summons - Branden Platter, #6 Summons - Frank Rogers)(Beggs, Breean) Modified on 6/22/2020 strike jury demand/ incorrectly requested (CDA). [Transferred from Washington Western on 9/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faire et al v. Okanogan County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kreg Sloan
Represented By: Paul L Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Christopher C Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Branden Platter
Represented By: Brian J Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Sloan
Represented By: Brian J Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Rogers
Represented By: Paul L Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Christopher C Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okanogan County
Represented By: Paul L Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Christopher C Browning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Faire
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Dillon
Represented By: Breean Lawrence Beggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Faire
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Dillon
Represented By: Breean Lawrence Beggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?