Fleetwood et al v. Washington State University
Plaintiff: Michael Fleetwood and Patrick Fleetwood
Defendant: Washington State University
Case Number: 2:2020cv00355
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by All Plaintiffs. (Crotty, Matthew)
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Washington State University. (Lefing, Debra)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Re: DEADLINES. Text entry; no pdf document will issue. The Court has received Plaintiffs Motion to Remand, ECF No. 7. The Motion to Remand hearing remains set on November 25, 2020, without oral argument. The Court will set a telephonic scheduling conference, if necessary, after the Motion to Remand has been decided. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A. Bastian. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2020 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Crotty, Matthew)
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Debra B Lefing on behalf of Washington State University (Attorney Debra B Lefing added to party Washington State University(pty:dft))(Lefing, Debra)
October 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Washington State University of State Filed Court Documents (Baker, Brian)
October 16, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Washington State University. (Baker, Brian)
October 2, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (CLP, Case Administrator)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Washington State University re #1 Notice of Removal to Whitman County (Baker, Brian)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Washington State University re #1 Notice of Removal to Adverse Party (Baker, Brian)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3578099 Filed by Washington State University. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Baker, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleetwood et al v. Washington State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Fleetwood
Represented By: Matthew Z Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Fleetwood
Represented By: Matthew Z Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State University
Represented By: Brian J Baker
Represented By: Debra B Lefing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?