Renteria et al v. Stemilt Ag Services
Plaintiff: Omar Palma Renteria
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Stemilt Ag Services LLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: Jonathan Gomez Rivera and Gilberto Gomez Garcia
Case Number: 2:2020cv00392
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Class Certification Hearing set for 5/6/2021 at 09:00 AM in Richland Courtroom 189. Signed by Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. (AY, Case Administrator) Modified on 12/21/2020 to add (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) (AY, Case Administrator).
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE by All Defendants re #10 Scheduling Conference Notice of Compliance with Notice Setting Court's Scheduling Conference (Siderius, Robert)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE by Gilberto Gomez Garcia, Omar Palma Renteria, Jonathan Gomez Rivera re #10 Scheduling Conference Notice of Compliance with Notice Setting Court's Scheduling Conference (Ponce de Leon, Xaxira)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Joint Certificate Pursuant to Rule 26 / Rule 16 by All Plaintiffs. (Cote, Marc)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne E Silver on behalf of Gilberto Gomez Garcia, Omar Palma Renteria, Jonathan Gomez Rivera (Attorney Anne E Silver added to party Omar Palma Renteria(pty:pla))(Silver, Anne)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie J Boehl on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Stephanie J Boehl added to party Does 1-10(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie J Boehl added to party Stemilt Ag Services LLC(pty:dft))(Boehl, Stephanie)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 08:30 AM via Teleconference before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Consent to MJ Form)(TNC, Courtroom Deputy)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joachim Morrison on behalf of Gilberto Gomez Garcia, Omar Palma Renteria, Jonathan Gomez Rivera (Attorney Joachim Morrison added to party Omar Palma Renteria(pty:pla))(Morrison, Joachim)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Xaxira Velasco Ponce de Leon on behalf of Gilberto Gomez Garcia, Omar Palma Renteria, Jonathan Gomez Rivera (Attorney Xaxira Velasco Ponce de Leon added to party Omar Palma Renteria(pty:pla))(Ponce de Leon, Xaxira)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Diana Garcia on behalf of Gilberto Gomez Garcia, Omar Palma Renteria, Jonathan Gomez Rivera (Attorney Maria Diana Garcia added to party Gilberto Gomez Garcia(pty:intvp), Attorney Maria Diana Garcia added to party Omar Palma Renteria(pty:pla), Attorney Maria Diana Garcia added to party Jonathan Gomez Rivera(pty:intvp))(Garcia, Maria) Modified on 11/2/2020 Filed on behalf of wrong attorney, will be refiled. (JW, ECF Admin).
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M Phelan on behalf of Gilberto Gomez Garcia, Omar Palma Renteria, Jonathan Gomez Rivera (Attorney Sean M Phelan added to party Gilberto Gomez Garcia(pty:intvp), Attorney Sean M Phelan added to party Omar Palma Renteria(pty:pla), Attorney Sean M Phelan added to party Jonathan Gomez Rivera(pty:intvp))(Phelan, Sean)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc C Cote on behalf of Gilberto Gomez Garcia, Omar Palma Renteria, Jonathan Gomez Rivera (Attorney Marc C Cote added to party Omar Palma Renteria(pty:pla))(Cote, Marc)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All Defendants. (Siderius, Robert)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DECLARATION of Robert R. Siderius re #1 Notice of Removal by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Siderius, Robert)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DECLARATION of West Mathison re #1 Notice of Removal by All Defendants. (Siderius, Robert)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3597451 Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Siderius, Robert)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renteria et al v. Stemilt Ag Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Represented By: Stephanie J Boehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stemilt Ag Services LLC
Represented By: Robert R Siderius, Jr
Represented By: Peter Anthony Spadoni
Represented By: Stephanie J Boehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Palma Renteria
Represented By: Craig J Ackermann
Represented By: India Lin Bodien
Represented By: Brian Denlinger
Represented By: Marc C Cote
Represented By: Sean M Phelan
Represented By: Xaxira Velasco Ponce de Leon
Represented By: Joachim Morrison
Represented By: Anne E Silver
Represented By: Tatiana Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Jonathan Gomez Rivera
Represented By: Joachim Morrison
Represented By: Anne E Silver
Represented By: Marc C Cote
Represented By: Sean M Phelan
Represented By: Xaxira Velasco Ponce de Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Gilberto Gomez Garcia
Represented By: Joachim Morrison
Represented By: Anne E Silver
Represented By: Marc C Cote
Represented By: Sean M Phelan
Represented By: Xaxira Velasco Ponce de Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?