Okanogan Valley Transportation LLC v. Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Okanogan Valley Transportation LLC
Defendant: Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Co, Chubb National Insurance Co, Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company and XYZ Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00394
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator)
October 23, 2020 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:20-cv-01153. Docket sheet received.
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Defendants' #10 Motion to Transfer Case to USDC for the Eastern District of WA, Spokane Div.. Case will be sent to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Washington by electronic transfer 15 days following the date of this filing. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/23/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 Supplemental DECLARATION of William F. Knowles filed by Defendants Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Co, Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Co re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC for the Eastern District of WA, Spokane Div. (Knowles, William) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/23/2020.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY, filed by Defendants Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Co, Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Co, TO RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC for the Eastern District of WA, Spokane Div. (Knowles, William) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/23/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Eric Malkuch filed by Plaintiff Okanogan Valley Transportation LLC re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC for the Eastern District of WA, Spokane Div. (Moore, Joseph) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/23/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Okanogan Valley Transportation LLC, to #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC for the Eastern District of WA, Spokane Div.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moore, Joseph) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/23/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of William F. Knowles filed by Defendants Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Co, Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Co re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC for the Eastern District of WA, Spokane Div. (Knowles, William) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/23/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC for the Eastern District of WA, Spokane Div., filed by Defendants Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Co, Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/11/2020, (Knowles, William) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/23/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendants Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Co, Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Co (Knowles, William) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/23/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Okanogan Valley Transportation LLC (Moore, Joseph) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/23/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc for Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Co. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Co (Knowles, William) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/23/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Federal Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc, Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. for Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company (Knowles, William) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/23/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Federal Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc, Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. for Chubb National Insurance Co. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Chubb National Insurance Co (Knowles, William) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/23/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Okanogan Valley Transportation LLC (Moore, Joseph) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/23/2020.]
July 29, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff and Defendants must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/5/2020. (CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/23/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/23/2020.]
July 29, 2020 Judge James L. Robart added. (CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/23/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of William F. Knowles re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Defendants Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Co, Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Chubb National Insurance Co (Knowles, William) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/23/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 20-2-03005-31; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6493691) Attorney William F Knowles added to party Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney William F Knowles added to party Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney William F Knowles added to party Chubb National Insurance Co(pty:dft), filed by Chubb National Insurance Co, Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company, Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit [Declaration in Support of Notice of Removal])(Knowles, William) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Okanogan Valley Transportation LLC v. Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Property and Casualty Insurance Co
Represented By: Jordan A Hess
Represented By: William Frank Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb National Insurance Co
Represented By: Jordan A Hess
Represented By: William Frank Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Jordan A Hess
Represented By: William Frank Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Okanogan Valley Transportation LLC
Represented By: Joseph W Moore
Represented By: Joel P Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?