Old Republic Aerospace Inc v. Tamarack Aerospace Group Inc
Plaintiff: Old Republic Aerospace Inc
Defendant: Tamarack Aerospace Group Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00421
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Michael DeLeo on behalf of Old Republic Aerospace Inc (Attorney Michael DeLeo added to party Old Republic Aerospace Inc(pty:pla))(DeLeo, Michael)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF shall issue) GRANTING, for good cause shown and based on Defendant's representation that Plaintiff consents to the relief sought, Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer, ECF No. #11 . Defendant shall file any answer or other pleading responsive to Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF No. #1 , by January 11, 2021. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on this matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading To Complaint by Tamarack Aerospace Group Inc. Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Munding, John)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John Degnan Munding on behalf of Tamarack Aerospace Group Inc (Attorney John Degnan Munding added to party Tamarack Aerospace Group Inc(pty:dft))(Munding, John)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF Nos. #7 and #8 , Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Tina I. Mangarpan and Jeffrey S. Behar, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, are hereby added as counsel for Plaintiff Old Republic Aerospace, Inc. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on these matters. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Jeffrey S Behar. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3619442. by Old Republic Aerospace Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wojcik, Matthew)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Tina I Mangarpan. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3619435. by Old Republic Aerospace Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wojcik, Matthew)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE by Old Republic Aerospace Inc re Tamarack Aerospace Group Inc. (Wojcik, Matthew)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Tamarack Aerospace Group Inc. (AY, Case Administrator)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet by Old Republic Aerospace Inc. (Wojcik, Matthew)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Old Republic Aerospace Inc. (Wojcik, Matthew)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tamarack Aerospace Group Inc ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3615835) Jury Demand. Filed by Old Republic Aerospace Inc.(Wojcik, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Old Republic Aerospace Inc v. Tamarack Aerospace Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old Republic Aerospace Inc
Represented By: Matthew R Wojcik
Represented By: Brittany Anne Madderra
Represented By: Tina I Mangarpan
Represented By: Michael DeLeo
Represented By: Jeffrey S Behar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamarack Aerospace Group Inc
Represented By: John Degnan Munding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?