Mier v. Mutual of Enumclaw Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Edward Mier
Defendant: Mutual of Enumclaw Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00144
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE; granting #11 Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite. Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before July 16, 2021. Defendant shall file a reply to Plaintiff's response on or before July 30, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (SG, Case Administrator)
June 14, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Expedite by Edward Mier. Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2021 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Crotty, Matthew)
June 14, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Edward Mier. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2021 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Crotty, Matthew)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Mutual of Enumclaw Insurance Company re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplow, Steven)
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mutual of Enumclaw Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2021 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplow, Steven)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ACCEPTING #6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (CIC, Case Administrator)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Mutual of Enumclaw Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2021 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Caplow, Steven)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Mutual of Enumclaw Insurance Company (Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal) (Caplow, Steven)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Mutual of Enumclaw Insurance Company (State Court Record) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification of State Court Records)(Caplow, Steven)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Edward Mier Jury Demand (Crotty, Matthew)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 First RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mutual of Enumclaw Insurance Company. (Caplow, Steven)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-3775784 Filed by Mutual of Enumclaw Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit pgs 6-17, #2 Exhibit pgs 18-31, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Complaint)(Caplow, Steven)
April 26, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mier v. Mutual of Enumclaw Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Mier
Represented By: Matthew Z Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mutual of Enumclaw Insurance Company
Represented By: Arthur A Simpson
Represented By: Steven P Caplow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?