J C et al v. Temporary Housing Inc
Plaintiff: Ian Pickett, Khalia Pickett, K P, J C and Anessa Cameron
Defendant: Temporary Housing Inc doing business as CRS Temporary Housing
Case Number: 2:2021cv00174
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or For More Definite Statement filed by Temporary Housing Inc. (Esler, Brian)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or For More Definite Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Knudsen, Kathryn)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Temporary Housing Inc. (Esler, Brian)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or For More Definite Statement by Temporary Housing Inc. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Esler, Brian)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian William Esler on behalf of Temporary Housing Inc (Attorney Brian William Esler added to party Temporary Housing Inc(pty:dft))(Esler, Brian)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Temporary Housing Inc. (CIC, Case Administrator)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-3795503) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Knudsen, Kathryn)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (CIC, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J C et al v. Temporary Housing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Pickett
Represented By: Thomas F Webster
Represented By: William C Smart
Represented By: Isaac Ruiz
Represented By: Kathryn M Knudsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalia Pickett
Represented By: Thomas F Webster
Represented By: William C Smart
Represented By: Isaac Ruiz
Represented By: Kathryn M Knudsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K P
Represented By: Thomas F Webster
Represented By: William C Smart
Represented By: Isaac Ruiz
Represented By: Kathryn M Knudsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J C
Represented By: Thomas F Webster
Represented By: William C Smart
Represented By: Isaac Ruiz
Represented By: Kathryn M Knudsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anessa Cameron
Represented By: Thomas F Webster
Represented By: William C Smart
Represented By: Isaac Ruiz
Represented By: Kathryn M Knudsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temporary Housing Inc doing business as CRS Temporary Housing
Represented By: Brian William Esler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?