Serrano v. Washington State et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Serrano
Defendant: Trooper Tom Shirey, Washington State, Sergeant Michael Faulk, Trooper Russell Lee Sanders and Washington State Patrol
Case Number: 2:2021cv00191
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 08:50 AM in via Teleconference before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Consent to MJ Form)(TNC, Courtroom Deputy)
June 24, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by All Defendants.(Merrill, Katie)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by All Defendants Re #1 Notice of Removal,,. Description: Exhibit 8 and 11 were duplicative, this amended document is now correct.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons/Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Ntc Judge Assign, #3 Exhibit 3 - Aff Srvc - Shirey, #4 Exhibit 4 - Aff Srvc - WSP, #5 Exhibit 5 - Aff Srvc - Wa State, #6 Exhibit 6 - Aff Srvc - Faulk, #7 Exhibit 7 - NOA - Merrill, #8 Exhibit 8 - Aff Srvc - Sanders, #9 Exhibit 9 - Mtn Def Statement, #10 Exhibit 10 - Prpsd Ordr, #11 Exhibit 11 - NtcHrg, #12 Exhibit 12 - Ordr Def Statement, #13 Exhibit 13 - Amnd Cmpnt 1st, #14 Exhibit 14 - Jury Demand, #15 Exhibit Sup Court Dkt, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(Merrill, Katie)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Katie Merrill re #1 Notice of Removal,, by All Defendants. (Merrill, Katie)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-3813813 Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sup Ct Dkt 1, #2 Exhibit Sup Ct Dkt 2, #3 Exhibit Sup Ct Dkt 3, #4 Exhibit Sup Ct Dkt 4, #5 Exhibit Sup Ct Dkt 5, #6 Exhibit Sup Ct Dkt 6, #7 Exhibit Sup Ct Dkt 7, #8 Exhibit Sup Ct Dkt 8, #9 Exhibit Sup Ct Dkt 9, #10 Exhibit Sup Ct Dkt 10, #11 Exhibit Sup Ct Dkt 11, #12 Exhibit Sup Ct Dkt 12, #13 Exhibit Sup Ct Dkt 13, #14 Exhibit Sup Ct Dkt 14, #15 Exhibit Sup Ct Dkt, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(Merrill, Katie) Modified on 6/24/2021 - See amended document filed under ECF #3 (AY, Case Administrator).
June 17, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serrano v. Washington State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trooper Tom Shirey
Represented By: Katie L Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State
Represented By: Katie L Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Michael Faulk
Represented By: Katie L Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trooper Russell Lee Sanders
Represented By: Katie L Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Patrol
Represented By: Katie L Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Serrano
Represented By: Douglas Dwight Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?