Ladue et al v. Kettle Falls International Railway LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael LaDue and Amanda Ladue
Defendant: Kettle Falls International Railway LLC and Omnitrax Inc
Interested Party: Department of Labor and Industries of the State of Washington
Case Number: 2:2021cv00205
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Office: Spokane Office
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING #36 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW; Attorney Joseph A Grube terminated. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MRJ, Case Administrator)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (atty Joseph Grube) by Michael LaDue, Amanda Ladue. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Grube, Joseph)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to #34 Notice of Unavailability of Counsel filed by Kettle Falls International Railway LLC, Omnitrax Inc. (Weythman, Rylan)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Unavailability of Counsel by Kettle Falls International Railway LLC, Omnitrax Inc (Weythman, Rylan)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Status Conference for 5/27/2022 09:30 AM via video conference before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson pursuant to Scheduling Order, ECF No. #33 . (MRJ, Case Administrator)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER; Video Scheduling Conference set for August 26, 2021, is CANCELLED. Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2022 at 09:30 AM via Video Conference. Jury Trial set for 9/19/2022 at 09:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 901. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MRJ, Case Administrator)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 DEPARTMENT OF LABOR AND INDUSTRIES NOTICE OF STATUTORY INTEREST IN RECOVERY. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letters, #2 Transmittal Envelope) (MRJ, Case Administrator)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT by Michael LaDue. (Bracewell, Charles)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF Nos. #28 and #29 , Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Anthony Petru and Scott H. Levy, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, are hereby added as counsel for Plaintiffs. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Scott H. Levy. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-3842245. by Michael LaDue. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE)(Bracewell, Charles)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Anthony Petru. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number AWAEDC-3842241. by Michael LaDue. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE)(Bracewell, Charles)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Searcy Bracewell on behalf of Michael LaDue, Amanda Ladue (Attorney Charles Searcy Bracewell added to party Michael LaDue(pty:pla), Attorney Charles Searcy Bracewell added to party Amanda Ladue(pty:pla))(Bracewell, Charles)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Scheduling Conference set for 8/26/2021 at 02:30 PM in Spokane Courtroom 901 via Video Conference before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (PL, Courtroom Deputy)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:20-cv-01472. Docket sheet received.
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Transferring Case to Eastern District of Washington, Spokane Division, by electronic case transfer, signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke.Case will be transferred on 7/13/2021. (TW) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Joint Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order Transferring Venue, filed by Defendant Kettle Falls International Railway LLC. (Probstfeld, Ryan) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (Dkt. #21 ): Jury Trial is continued to 5/16/2022 at 09:30 AM in F Courtroom before Judge Theresa L Fricke. Joinder of Parties due by 8/26/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 8/26/2021, Disclosure of opening expert witnesses due by 8/27/2021, Disclosure of rebuttal expert witnesses due by 9/24/2021, Discovery completed by 11/26/2021, Dispositive motions due by 12/23/2021, Motions in Limine due by 2/11/2022, Pretrial Order due by 3/4/2022, Trial briefs, trial exhibits due by 3/28/2022. Signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE by parties (Levy, Scott) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULE by Judge Theresa L Fricke: Jury Trial is set for 2/7/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Theresa L Fricke. Joinder of Parties due by 7/1/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/2/2021, Motions related to discovery noted by 9/21/2021, Discovery completed by 10/1/2021, Dispositive motions due by 10/29/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2021, Motions in Limine due by 12/17/2021, Pretrial Order due by 1/7/2022, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 7/30/2021, Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/31/2022, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 1/31/2022. (DK) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 10. (Levy, Scott) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating OmniTRAX Holdings Combine Inc no as Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Kettle Falls International Railway LLC (Probstfeld, Ryan) Modified on 1/8/2021 (KMC). [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: At the request of counsel for the parties by email, the Initial Disclosure Deadline is extended from 1/15/2021 to 1/22/2021. (TW) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. No declinations of consent received. (TW) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Carole M Bosch for Plaintiff Amanda Ladue. (Bosch, Carole) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Scott H Levy for plaintiffs Amanda Ladue and Michael Ladue, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Anthony S Petru for plaintiffs Amanda Ladue and Michael Ladue, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Scott H. Levy FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Michael Ladue and Amanda Ladue (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6814351 (Grube, Joseph) Modified on 12/17/2020 correct text to show both plaintiffs (CDA). [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Anthony S. Petru FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Michael Ladue and Amanda Ladue (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6814309 (Grube, Joseph) Modified on 12/17/2020 correct text to show both plaintiffs (CDA). [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph Andrew Grube on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Ladue. (Grube, Joseph) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR. NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph Andrew Grube on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Ladue. (Grube, Joseph) Modified on 12/17/2020 to strike per phone call from filer (PM). [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #10 Notice of Appearance: edited docket text to strike as document was filed in error, per phone call. Filer will post correct document. (PM) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Attorney Joseph Andrew Grube for Amanda Ladue added; per #11 Notice of Appearance. (CDA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 12/23/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TW) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Rylan L. S. Weythman on behalf of Defendants Kettle Falls International Railway LLC, Omnitrax Inc. (Weythman, Rylan) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kettle Falls International Railway LLC, Omnitrax Inc. (Probstfeld, Ryan) Modified on 12/15/2020 to link document (KMC) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on OmniTRAX, Inc. on 11/9/2020, filed by Plaintiff Michael Ladue. (Bosch, Carole) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Kettle Falls International Railway on 10/9/2020, filed by Plaintiff Michael Ladue. (Bosch, Carole) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 1/22/2021, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 1/8/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/15/2021, by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (TW) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order JSR deadline NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 1/22/2021, (TW) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Kettle Falls International Railway LLC, Omnitrax Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons- Omnitrax)(RE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (RE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Michael Ladue with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6642598) Attorney Carole M Bosch added to party Michael Ladue(pty:pla), filed by Michael Ladue. (Attachments: #1 Summons Kettle Falls International Railway, LLC, #2 Summons OmniTrax, Inc., #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bosch, Carole) [Transferred from Washington Western on 7/13/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ladue et al v. Kettle Falls International Railway LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael LaDue
Represented By: Anthony S Petru
Represented By: Carole M Bosch
Represented By: Scott H Levy
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Grube
Represented By: Charles Searcy Bracewell
Represented By: Joseph A Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Ladue
Represented By: Anthony S Petru
Represented By: Carole M Bosch
Represented By: Scott H Levy
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Grube
Represented By: Charles Searcy Bracewell
Represented By: Joseph A Grube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kettle Falls International Railway LLC
Represented By: Ryan T Probstfeld
Represented By: Rylan L S Weythman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnitrax Inc
Represented By: Ryan T Probstfeld
Represented By: Rylan L S Weythman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Department of Labor and Industries of the State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?