Bresheare et al v. Gilead Sciences Inc
Plaintiff: Vaughn L Bresheare and John Doe 27
Defendant: Gilead Sciences Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00208
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Case transferred from Washington Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:21-cv-06461, filed 08/20/2021. (JW, ECF Admin)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 JOINT MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. Case transferred to the Northern District of California. This file is CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LTR, Case Administrator)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Vaughn L Bresheare, John Doe 27. Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2021 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berman, Steve)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ACCEPTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT. The parties' Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Gilead Sciences, Inc. to Respond to Complaint, ECF No. #3 , is accepted and entered into the record. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF No. #1 , on or before August 20, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LTR, Case Administrator)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Gilead Sciences, Inc. to Respond to Complaint by Gilead Sciences Inc (Ahern, Hunter). Agreed response deadline: 8/20/2021. Modified on 7/21/2021 to include full document title and response deadline (LTR, Case Administrator).
July 15, 2021 Filing 2 First RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gilead Sciences Inc. (Ahern, Hunter)
July 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-3830930 Filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A State Court Case File/Complaint)(Ahern, Hunter)
July 15, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bresheare et al v. Gilead Sciences Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaughn L Bresheare
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 27
Represented By: Steve W Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences Inc
Represented By: Hunter K Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?