Finney v. Logan
Plaintiff: Roland Finney
Defendant: Mary Logan
Case Number: 2:2021cv00216
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. The District Court Executive shall set a case management review for 30 days, and immediately notify the assigned judicial officer, who will review the Complaint for legal sufficiency. IT IS SO ORDERED. - Text entry; no PDF document. Case Management Deadline set for 8/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE by Roland Finney re Mary Logan. (CLP, Case Administrator)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals a lack of information regarding assets and expenses. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Case Management Deadline set for 8/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (CLP, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
July 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mary Logan. (CLP, Case Administrator)
July 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mary Logan (Filing Fee $402, Receipt # IFP Pending) Filed by Roland Finney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CLP, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finney v. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Finney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?