Mayer v. State of Washington et al
Plaintiff: Richard Mayer
Defendant: State of Washington, Washington State Department of Corrections, Airway Heights Corrections Center, Jared Beerbahn, James R Key, Sandra A (Thompson) Conner, Deborah Tonhofer, Steven Hammond, Rusty Smith, Albert Tripp, City of Airway Heights, JOHN/JANE DOE and JOHN/JANE DOES 2-10
Case Number: 2:2021cv00269
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 Joint Certificate Pursuant to Rule 26 / Rule 16 and Discovery Plan by Airway Heights Corrections Center, Jared Beerbahn, Sandra A (Thompson) Conner, Steven Hammond, James R Key, Rusty Smith, State of Washington, Deborah Tonhofer, Washington State Department of Corrections. (McNulty, Katherine)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendants Airway Heights Corrections Center, Jared Beerbahn, Sandra A (Thompson) Conner, Steven Hammond, James R Key, Rusty Smith, State of Washington, Deborah Tonhofer, Washington State Department of Corrections. Attorney Katie L. Merrill is withdrawing. Katherine A McNulty is substituted as counsel for Defendants. (Attorney Katherine A McNulty added to party Airway Heights Corrections Center(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine A McNulty added to party Jared Beerbahn(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine A McNulty added to party Sandra A (Thompson) Conner(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine A McNulty added to party Steven Hammond(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine A McNulty added to party James R Key(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine A McNulty added to party Rusty Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine A McNulty added to party State of Washington(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine A McNulty added to party Deborah Tonhofer(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine A McNulty added to party Washington State Department of Corrections(pty:dft))(McNulty, Katherine)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 02:30 PM by Video Conference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 State Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by Airway Heights Corrections Center, Jared Beerbahn, Sandra A (Thompson) Conner, Steven Hammond, James R Key, Rusty Smith, State of Washington, Deborah Tonhofer, Washington State Department of Corrections.(Merrill, Katie)
September 14, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Katie Merrill Providing add'l State Court Documents re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Airway Heights Corrections Center, Jared Beerbahn, Sandra A (Thompson) Conner, Steven Hammond, James R Key, Rusty Smith, State of Washington, Deborah Tonhofer, Washington State Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Amended Ntc to Appr, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Ntc of Wthdrwl)(Merrill, Katie)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Katie L. Merrill re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Airway Heights Corrections Center, Jared Beerbahn, Sandra Conner, Steven Hammond, James R Key, Rusty Smith, State of Washington, Deborah Tonhofer, Washington State Department of Corrections. (Merrill, Katie)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-3870074 Filed by James R Key, State of Washington, Airway Heights Corrections Center, Jared Beerbahn, Steven Hammond, Deborah Tonhofer, Rusty Smith, Sandra Conner, Washington State Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sup. Ct. Dckt, #2 Exhibit Smns and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ntc Assignment, #4 Exhibit NOA Merrill, #5 Exhibit Dec Service, #6 Exhibit NOA Clark, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Merrill, Katie)
September 10, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayer v. State of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Mayer
Represented By: Douglas Dwight Phelps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Represented By: Katie L Merrill
Represented By: Katherine A McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections
Represented By: Katie L Merrill
Represented By: Katherine A McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airway Heights Corrections Center
Represented By: Katie L Merrill
Represented By: Katherine A McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Beerbahn
Represented By: Katie L Merrill
Represented By: Katherine A McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R Key
Represented By: Katie L Merrill
Represented By: Katherine A McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra A (Thompson) Conner
Represented By: Katie L Merrill
Represented By: Katherine A McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Tonhofer
Represented By: Katie L Merrill
Represented By: Katherine A McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Hammond
Represented By: Katie L Merrill
Represented By: Katherine A McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rusty Smith
Represented By: Katie L Merrill
Represented By: Katherine A McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Tripp
Represented By: Megan C Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Airway Heights
Represented By: Megan C Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE DOES 2-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?