Draggoo v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Darcey Lynn Draggoo
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 2:2021cv00273
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick Fripps on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Frederick Fripps added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Fripps, Frederick)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John T Drake on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney John T Drake added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Drake, John)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The pending #4 Report and Recommendation is vacated as moot. The filing fee has been paid. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
September 21, 2021 Payment for Civil Case ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-3877078).. (Penar, Gary)
September 14, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re ECF No. 2 ***Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by: Darcey Lynn Draggoo. (Penar, Gary) filed by Darcey Lynn Draggoo. Objections to R&R due by 9/28/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (TR, Case Administrator)
September 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (TR, Case Administrator)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security IFP Pending Filed by Darcey Lynn Draggoo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Penar, Gary)
September 13, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Draggoo v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darcey Lynn Draggoo
Represented By: Gary R Penar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Frederick Fripps
Represented By: John T Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?