Snedden v. Strange
Petitioner: Steven Snedden
Respondent: Cheryl Strange
Case Number: 2:2021cv00286
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, DENYING #8 #10 #11 #15 #16 #18 #19 #25 #26 #27 #28 MULTIPLE MOTIONS AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/30/2021. Signed by Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (AY, Case Administrator) **10 PAGES, PRINT ALL** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
November 29, 2021 Filing 29 Reply to State's Brief/Amended Memorandum of Law Re: Writs of Mandamus and Habeas Corpus by Steven Snedden. (SG, Case Administrator) **27 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
November 29, 2021 Filing 28 Amended Motion for Writs of Mandamus and Habeas Corpus by Steven Snedden. Motion Hearing set for 12/29/2021 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (SG, Case Administrator) **6 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
November 29, 2021 Filing 27 Motion to Withdraw and Substitute Pleadings and to add State of Washington as a Respondent by Steven Snedden. Motion Hearing set for 12/29/2021 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (SG, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
November 22, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION TO ADMIT AMENDED AFFIDAVIT TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Steven Snedden. Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2021 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Amended IFP Application, #2 Amendment to Affidavit to Proceed IFP, #3 PLRA)(CLP, Case Administrator) **10 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
November 22, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus and Habeas Corpus by Steven Snedden. Motion Hearing set for 12/22/2021 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Reply to State's Brief/Memorandum of Law re: Writ of Habeas Corpus and Mandamus)(CLP, Case Administrator) **34 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
November 22, 2021 Filing 24 Letter from Steven Snedden to Honorable Judge Peterson dated 11/22/2021. (CLP, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
November 19, 2021 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT by Steven Sneeden re #22 Order Denying IFP. (Attachments: #1 Copy of IFP Application)(CLP, Case Administrator) **8 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
November 10, 2021 Set Deadline: **1 PAGE, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328) Case Management Deadline set for 11/30/2021 re: order ECF #22 . (CLP, Case Administrator)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING APPLICATIONS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING PAYMENT OF THE FILING FEE; Petitioner's requests to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF Nos. 2 , #3 , 6 , #8 , and 12 , are DENIED. Petitioner is directed to pay the $5.00 filing fee within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, or show cause by sworn affidavit why he should not be required to do so. Signed by Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (CLP, Case Administrator) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
October 28, 2021 Filing 21 Letter from Steven Snedden to Judge of the District Court dated 10/28/2021 re: Amendments. (CLP, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
October 28, 2021 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service by E-Filing re #18 MOTION to Withdraw, #19 MOTION to Admit Third Amended Memorandum of Law re: Writ of Habeas Corpus by Steven Snedden. (CLP, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
October 28, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Admit Third Amended Memorandum of Law re: Writ of Habeas Corpus by Steven Snedden. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2021 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (CLP, Case Administrator) **27 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
October 28, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw Documents and Pleadings and Substitute Amended Documents and Pleadings by Steven Snedden. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2021 Without Oral Argument before Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion Docket Noted)(CLP, Case Administrator) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
October 22, 2021 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service by E-filing re #15 MOTION to Withdraw, #16 MOTION to Admit Amended Memorandum of Law by Steven Snedden. (CLP, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
October 22, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Admit Second Amended Memorandum of Law re: Writ of Habeas Corpus by Steven Snedden. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (CLP, Case Administrator) **28 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
October 22, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw Documents and to Substitute Amended Documents by Steven Snedden. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion Docket Noted)(CLP, Case Administrator) **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
October 13, 2021 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY E-FILING by Steven Snedden. (CLP, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
October 13, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion Docket Noted by Steven Snedden. (CLP, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
October 13, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Admit Amended Memorandum of Law re: Writ of Habeas Corpus and to Admit Additional Authorities by Steven Snedden. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (CLP, Case Administrator) **28 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw Documents and to Admit New Documents by Steven Snedden. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (CLP, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: Writ of Habeas Corpus re #4 Memorandum by Steven Snedden. (CLP, Case Administrator) **25 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 SECOND MOTION for Order of Indigency by Steven Snedden. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (CLP, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (Attachments: #1 SUBMIT CERTIFICATE SECTION ONLY) (CLP, Case Administrator) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Steven Snedden. (CLP, Case Administrator) **37 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Order of Indigency, Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Steven Snedden. Motion Hearing set for 11/3/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (CLP, Case Administrator) **1 PAGE, PRINT NEF ONLY** (Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5 Receipt #IFP Pending.) Filed by Steven Snedden.(CLP, Case Administrator) **15 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Steven Snedden, Prisoner ID: 300328)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snedden v. Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Snedden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cheryl Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?