Nolan et al v. Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids Michigan
Plaintiff: Lori Nolan and Ernest Nolan
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids Michigan
Case Number: 2:2021cv00302
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2021 at 8:30 AM before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids Michigan.(MacLaren, Scott)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids Michigan. (MacLaren, Scott)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and #5 Stipulated Motion to Expedite the same. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, Defendant shall file an Answer or otherwise plead no later than 11/5/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 Stipulated MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids Michigan. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Scott A. MacLaren)(Maloney, Francis)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids Michigan. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Scott A. MacLaren)(Maloney, Francis)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids Michigan. (Maloney, Francis)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Scott A. MacLaren re #1 Notice of Removal by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Maloney, Francis)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-3899164 Filed by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Maloney, Francis)
October 20, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nolan et al v. Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Nolan
Represented By: Christopher Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Nolan
Represented By: Christopher Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids Michigan
Represented By: Scott A MacLaren
Represented By: Francis J Maloney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?