Miller et al v. Auto Credit Sales et al
Plaintiff: Jefferson L Miller and Cynthia L Braughton
Defendant: Auto Credit Sales and Phoenix Financial LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00041
Filed: March 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Injunction
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Auto Credit Sales. (Johnson, Reid)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT re #13 Response to Motion by Jefferson L Miller. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope)(BF, Paralegal)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cynthia L Braughton, Jefferson L Miller. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope)(BF, Paralegal)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO TIMELY RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' #11 MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2022 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Johnson, Reid)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendation by Cynthia L Braughton, Jefferson L Miller. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope)(BF, Paralegal)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Zaine Matthew Yzaguirre on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Zaine Matthew Yzaguirre added to party Auto Credit Sales(pty:dft), Attorney Zaine Matthew Yzaguirre added to party Phoenix Financial LLC(pty:dft))(Yzaguirre, Zaine)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Reid Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Reid Johnson added to party Auto Credit Sales(pty:dft), Attorney Reid Johnson added to party Phoenix Financial LLC(pty:dft))(Johnson, Reid)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Reissued as to all defendants. (AY, Case Administrator) Modified on 3/22/2022 to correct docket text (AY, Case Administrator).
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 COMPLAINT against Auto Credit Sales, Phoenix Financial LLC (Filing Fee $402, Receipt # IFP Pending) Jury Demand. Objections to R&R due by 4/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (AY, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Re All Defendants. (AY, Case Administrator)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (AY, Case Administrator)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Auto Credit Sales, Phoenix Financial LLC (Filing Fee $402, Receipt # IFP Pending) Jury Demand. Filed by Jefferson L Miller, Cynthia L Braughton. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(AY, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Auto Credit Sales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jefferson L Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia L Braughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Credit Sales
Represented By: Reid Johnson
Represented By: Zaine Matthew Yzaguirre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Financial LLC
Represented By: Reid Johnson
Represented By: Zaine Matthew Yzaguirre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?