Spaeth v. Pinnacle Biologics Inc et al
Plaintiff: Zona Gail Spaeth
Defendant: Pinnacle Biologics Inc, Advanz Pharma Corp and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2022cv00048
Filed: March 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary K Dimke
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #3 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND. Case remanded to Spokane County Superior Court. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. (LTR, Case Administrator)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Jury Demand. Filed by Zona Gail Spaeth.(Armitage, Nik)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint, ECF No. #3 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to Spokane County Superior Court, ECF No. #3 , will be held in ABEYANCE until Plaintiff files an Amended Complaint. Case management deadline to file amended complaint set for 5/18/2022. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. (LTR, Case Administrator)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Deadline set for 5/18/2022 pursuant to Order filed at ECF No. #6 . (LTR, Case Administrator)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Remand and Amend filed by Pinnacle Biologics Inc. (Crow, Jennifer)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DECLARATION by Nik Armitage in Support re #3 MOTION to Remand and Amend filed by Zona Gail Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Armitage, Nik)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Remand and Amend by Zona Gail Spaeth. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2022 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Armitage, Nik)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Zona Gail Spaeth. (Armitage, Nik)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-3996002 Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Acceptance of Service)(Crow, Jennifer)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (CLP, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spaeth v. Pinnacle Biologics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zona Gail Spaeth
Represented By: Nik O Armitage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Biologics Inc
Represented By: Richard Anthony Francisco
Represented By: Mark Preston Scheer
Represented By: Jennifer L Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanz Pharma Corp
Represented By: Mark Preston Scheer
Represented By: Richard Anthony Francisco
Represented By: Jennifer L Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?