Cordes v. Mead School District No. 354 et al
Plaintiff: Braeden Cordes
Defendant: Mead School District No. 354, Ryan Chan, Gilbert Chan, Melissa Chan and Jane and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2022cv00123
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Filing 9 Joint Certificate Pursuant to Rule 26 / Rule 16 by Braeden Cordes. (Wagley, Andrew)
July 11, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Braeden Cordes re All Plaintiffs. (Wagley, Andrew)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 8/10/2022 at 8:15 AM before Judge Thomas O. Rice. The parties' Joint Status Report is due no later than 7/27/2022. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
June 23, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by Gilbert Chan, Melissa Chan.(Dunn, Aaron)
June 15, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by Mead School District No. 354.(McFarland, Michael)
June 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance and Intent to Video Record Depositions by Joshua Ahren Grissom on behalf of Gilbert Chan, Melissa Chan, Ryan Chan (Attorney Joshua Ahren Grissom added to party Gilbert Chan(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Ahren Grissom added to party Melissa Chan(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua Ahren Grissom added to party Ryan Chan(pty:dft))(Grissom, Joshua)
June 14, 2022 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gilbert Chan, Melissa Chan, Ryan Chan. (Dunn, Aaron)
June 14, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance and Intent to Video Record Depositions by Aaron Dunn on behalf of Gilbert Chan, Melissa Chan, Ryan Chan (Attorney Aaron Dunn added to party Gilbert Chan(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Dunn added to party Melissa Chan(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Dunn added to party Ryan Chan(pty:dft))(Dunn, Aaron)
May 20, 2022 Filing 1 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mead School District No. 354 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(McFarland, Michael) Modified on 5/20/2022 to correct document title (CLP, Case Administrator).
May 20, 2022 Filing Fee Received. Receipt #2706QQ4G in the amount of $402.00 from Michael Earl McFarland. (LTR, Case Administrator)
May 20, 2022 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cordes v. Mead School District No. 354 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Braeden Cordes
Represented By: Andrew M Wagley
Represented By: Carl Joseph Oreskovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mead School District No. 354
Represented By: Michael E McFarland, Jr
Represented By: Thomas Murphy-Rohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Chan
Represented By: Aaron Dunn
Represented By: Joshua Ahren Grissom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Chan
Represented By: Aaron Dunn
Represented By: Joshua Ahren Grissom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Chan
Represented By: Aaron Dunn
Represented By: Joshua Ahren Grissom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?