Armatis v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Scott Armatis
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv00279
Filed: September 26, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James A Goeke
Referring Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2023 Filing 10 Clerk's ORDER OF RANDOM REASSIGNMENT. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. TEXT-ONLY ENTRY; NO PDF DOCUMENT WILL ISSUE. This text-only entry constitutes the order or notice by the Court. (LAS, Case Administrator)
October 23, 2023 Filing 9 Clerks Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent Form. Please Note: Declination of Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Parties wishing to decline consent of this assignment must complete and return the attached Declination of Consent Form to the Clerk of Court by the Case Management Deadline set for 11/2/2023. (WMK, Case Administrator)
October 23, 2023 Filing 8 BNSF Railway Company's ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BNSF Railway Company.(Mitchell, Andrew)
October 3, 2023 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs re All Defendants. (Cohen, C N)
October 2, 2023 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BNSF Railway Company. (Mitchell, Andrew)
October 2, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Vicki L Mitchell on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (Attorney Vicki L Mitchell added to party BNSF Railway Company(pty:dft))(Mitchell, Vicki)
October 2, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J Mitchell on behalf of BNSF Railway Company (Attorney Andrew J Mitchell added to party BNSF Railway Company(pty:dft))(Mitchell, Andrew)
September 26, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BNSF Railway Company. (WMK, Case Administrator)
September 26, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent Form. Please Note: Declination of Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Parties wishing to decline consent of this assignment must complete and return the attached Declination of Consent Form to the Clerk of Court by the Case Management Deadline set for 10/6/2023. (WMK, Case Administrator)
September 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNSF Railway Company ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-4383248) Jury Demand. Filed by Scott Armatis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Cohen, C N)
September 26, 2023 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke assigned to case. (WMK, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armatis v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Armatis
Represented By: C N Coby Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Andrew J Mitchell
Represented By: Vicki L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?