Wieler v. National Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: Don Wieler
Defendant: National Indemnity Company and Lisa Norgard
Estate Plaintiff: Eddie Todd
Case Number: 2:2023cv00285
Filed: October 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2023 Filing 13 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lisa Norgard. (Beatty, Jacquelyn)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2023 is STRICKEN. Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2024 at 11:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 755. Jury Trial set for 11/4/2024 at 09:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 755, commencing with a Final Pretrial Conference at 08:30 AM. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (WMK, Case Administrator)
November 13, 2023 Filing 11 STATUS REPORT - Joint by Don Wieler. (Casey, Marshall)
November 8, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2024 at 01:30 PM in Spokane Courtroom 755 before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Casey, Marshall)
October 19, 2023 Filing 9 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2023 at 09:30 AM by Video Conference before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
October 19, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Thomas Knight on behalf of National Indemnity Company (Attorney Jeremy Thomas Knight added to party National Indemnity Company(pty:dft))(Knight, Jeremy)
October 18, 2023 Filing 7 DECLARATION by Jacquelyn A. Beatty in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lisa Norgard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Beatty, Jacquelyn)
October 18, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lisa Norgard. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2024 at 01:30 PM in Spokane Courtroom 755 before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beatty, Jacquelyn)
October 6, 2023 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Jacquelyn A. Beatty re #1 Notice of Removal by Lisa Norgard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Beatty, Jacquelyn)
October 3, 2023 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Indemnity Company. (McDougall, Jodi) Modified on 10/4/2023 to update title to match PDF. (WMK, Case Administrator)
October 3, 2023 Filing 3 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by National Indemnity Company.(McDougall, Jodi)
October 3, 2023 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Don Wieler. (Casey, Marshall)
October 2, 2023 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (REM, Case Administrator)
October 2, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $402; Receipt #AWAEDC-4388542 Filed by Lisa Norgard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beatty, Jacquelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wieler v. National Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Wieler
Represented By: Marshall W Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Estate plaintiff: Eddie Todd
Represented By: Marshall W Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Indemnity Company
Represented By: Jodi A McDougall
Represented By: Jeremy Thomas Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Norgard
Represented By: Jacquelyn A Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?