Baker v. Andrewjeski
Petitioner: John Baker
Respondent: Melissa Andrewjeski
Case Number: 2:2024cv00018
Filed: January 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2024 Filing Fee Received. Receipt #27CH4PVF in the amount of $5.00 from Sandra Dianne Baker. (LTR, Case Administrator) **PRINT NEF ONLY** (John Baker, Prisoner ID: 357750)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE. Case management deadline set for 4/1/2024. Signed by Senior Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (LAS, Case Administrator) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (John Baker, Prisoner ID: 357750)
March 1, 2024 Case Management Deadline set pursuant to Court Order filed at ECF No. #4 . Filing Fee due by 4/1/2024. **TEXT ONLY ENTRY, PRINT NEF ONLY** (John Baker, Prisoner ID: 357750) (LAS, Case Administrator)
January 24, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5 Receipt #IFP Pending.) Filed by John Baker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BM, Case Administrator) **29 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Andrewjeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Melissa Andrewjeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?