Moon v. Washington State University et al
Plaintiff: Renata S Moon
Defendant: James Record, Radha Nandagopal, Jeff Haney, Daryll Dewald, Washington State University, Dawn Cooper, Kirk Schulz, Gail Chermak, John Tomkowiak, Lisa Burch-Windrem and Ken Roberts
Case Number: 2:2024cv00327
Filed: September 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary K Dimke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 cv Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs re Lisa Burch-Windrem, Gail Chermak, Dawn Cooper, Daryll Dewald, Jeff Haney, Radha Nandagopal, James Record, Ken Roberts, Kirk Schulz, John Tomkowiak. (Attachments: #1 Chermak - Waiver executed, #2 Cooper - Waiver executed, #3 Dewald - Waiver executed, #4 Haney - Waiver executed, #5 Nandagopal - Waiver executed, #6 Record - Waiver executed, #7 Roberts - Waiver executed, #8 Schulz - Waiver executed, #9 Tomkowiak - Waiver executed)(Serrano, Simon)
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Before the Court is the parties' Stipulated Motion to Extend Defendant Washington State University's Answer Deadline, ECF No. #6 . The parties request that Washington State University's deadline to file a responsive pleading be extended to December 9, 2024, to align with the other Defendants' responsive pleading deadline. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The parties' Stipulated Motion to Extend Defendant Washington State University's Answer Deadline, ECF No. #6 , is GRANTED. Defendant Washington State University shall file its responsive pleading by December 9, 2024. Text-only entry; no PDF will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the Court. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. (CV, Courtroom Deputy)
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2024 Without Oral Argument before Judge Mary K. Dimke. (Pekelis, Zachary)
October 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J Lawrence on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Paul J Lawrence added to party Lisa Burch-Windrem(pty:dft), Attorney Paul J Lawrence added to party Gail Chermak(pty:dft), Attorney Paul J Lawrence added to party Dawn Cooper(pty:dft), Attorney Paul J Lawrence added to party Daryll Dewald(pty:dft), Attorney Paul J Lawrence added to party Jeff Haney(pty:dft), Attorney Paul J Lawrence added to party Radha Nandagopal(pty:dft), Attorney Paul J Lawrence added to party James Record(pty:dft), Attorney Paul J Lawrence added to party Ken Roberts(pty:dft), Attorney Paul J Lawrence added to party Kirk Schulz(pty:dft), Attorney Paul J Lawrence added to party John Tomkowiak(pty:dft), Attorney Paul J Lawrence added to party Washington State University(pty:dft))(Lawrence, Paul)
October 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by W Scott Ferron on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney W Scott Ferron added to party Lisa Burch-Windrem(pty:dft), Attorney W Scott Ferron added to party Gail Chermak(pty:dft), Attorney W Scott Ferron added to party Dawn Cooper(pty:dft), Attorney W Scott Ferron added to party Daryll Dewald(pty:dft), Attorney W Scott Ferron added to party Jeff Haney(pty:dft), Attorney W Scott Ferron added to party Radha Nandagopal(pty:dft), Attorney W Scott Ferron added to party James Record(pty:dft), Attorney W Scott Ferron added to party Ken Roberts(pty:dft), Attorney W Scott Ferron added to party Kirk Schulz(pty:dft), Attorney W Scott Ferron added to party John Tomkowiak(pty:dft), Attorney W Scott Ferron added to party Washington State University(pty:dft))(Ferron, W Scott)
October 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary J Pekelis on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Zachary J Pekelis added to party Lisa Burch-Windrem(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary J Pekelis added to party Gail Chermak(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary J Pekelis added to party Dawn Cooper(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary J Pekelis added to party Daryll Dewald(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary J Pekelis added to party Jeff Haney(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary J Pekelis added to party Radha Nandagopal(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary J Pekelis added to party James Record(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary J Pekelis added to party Ken Roberts(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary J Pekelis added to party Kirk Schulz(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary J Pekelis added to party John Tomkowiak(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary J Pekelis added to party Washington State University(pty:dft))(Pekelis, Zachary)
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Burch-Windrem, #2 Summons Chermak, #3 Summons Cooper, #4 Summons Dewald, #5 Summons Haney, #6 Summons Nandagopal, #7 Summons Record, #8 Summons Roberts, #9 Summons Schulz, #10 Summons Tomkowiak)(TNC, Case Administrator)
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405; Receipt # AWAEDC-4636583) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover, #2 Exhibit Declaration - Osborne, #3 Exhibit Declaration - Moon, #4 Summons Summons - Washington State University, #5 Summons Summons - Burch Windrem, #6 Summons Summons - Chermak, #7 Summons Summons - Cooper, #8 Summons Summons - Dewald, #9 Summons Summons - Haney, #10 Summons Summons - Nandagopal, #11 Summons Summons - Record, #12 Summons Summons - Roberts, #13 Summons Summons - Schulz, #14 Summons Summons - Tomkowiak)(Serrano, Simon) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/24/2024: with corrected caption) (TNC, Case Administrator).
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (TNC, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moon v. Washington State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Record
Represented By: Zachary J Pekelis
Represented By: W Scott Ferron
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radha Nandagopal
Represented By: Zachary J Pekelis
Represented By: W Scott Ferron
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Haney
Represented By: Zachary J Pekelis
Represented By: W Scott Ferron
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryll Dewald
Represented By: Zachary J Pekelis
Represented By: W Scott Ferron
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State University
Represented By: Zachary J Pekelis
Represented By: W Scott Ferron
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Cooper
Represented By: Zachary J Pekelis
Represented By: W Scott Ferron
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Schulz
Represented By: Zachary J Pekelis
Represented By: W Scott Ferron
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Chermak
Represented By: Zachary J Pekelis
Represented By: W Scott Ferron
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Tomkowiak
Represented By: Zachary J Pekelis
Represented By: W Scott Ferron
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Burch-Windrem
Represented By: Zachary J Pekelis
Represented By: W Scott Ferron
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Roberts
Represented By: Zachary J Pekelis
Represented By: W Scott Ferron
Represented By: Paul J Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renata S Moon
Represented By: Simon Peter Serrano
Represented By: Karen L Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?