Humphreys v. No Named Defendant
Plaintiff: Scott W Humphreys
Defendant: No Named Defendant
Case Number: 2:2024cv00437
Filed: December 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary K Dimke
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/4/2025. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. (TNC, Case Administrator) **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Scott Humphreys, Prisoner ID: 372442)
January 6, 2025 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Scott W Humphreys. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(TNC, Case Administrator) **10 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Scott Humphreys, Prisoner ID: 372442)
December 31, 2024 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk - Advising prisoner of case number and deficiency. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application Form) (TNC, Case Administrator) **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Scott Humphreys, Prisoner ID: 372442)
December 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee not paid and no IFP submitted) Filed by Scott W Humphreys.(TNC, Case Administrator) **12 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Scott Humphreys, Prisoner ID: 372442) (Entered: 12/31/2024)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humphreys v. No Named Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: No Named Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott W Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?