Gallup et al v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Edward Alan Monk, Christi Lynn Gallop and Christi Lynn Gallup
Defendant: US Courts, James S Savett, Rod Rosenstein, Kennewick Police Dept, Deputy USM Ryan Johnsen, Doe, Deborah L Hunt, Benton County Prosecutors Office, Robert W Ferguson, Stanley A Bastian, Philip Pro, FBI, Robert Mueller, James Comey, Canyon Lakes, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, USMS, Brian Sweeney, Deborah Denton Hunt, Stanley Bastian, Benton County Prosecutor, AG, Mike Kreidler, DSHS-DCYF Offices, Canyon Lakes POA, Kelly E Brady, Judge Joseph Burrowes, City of Kennewick Attorney Office, Todd Sprong, John Doe(s), State of Washington Governor, Philip M Pro, Ascena Retail Group Inc, Jay Inslee, Andrew Hunt, Bob Ferguson, Ken Hohenberg, Lisa Beaton, Marisol Cintron, Jerry Martin, OIC, Deborah A Denton, DOJ, Leslie Gail McAnallen, Robert J Mueller, Gina Hunt, Andy Miller, City of Kennewick Police Department, Benton County Superior Court, The Matrix Companies, USAO and Ivy Kohlquist
Case Number: 4:2018cv05185
Filed: November 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Canyon Lakes POA, Jerry Martin, Todd Sprong. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Downer, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Regarding Judge Stanley Bastian by Stanley Bastian. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Claims Regarding Judge Stanley Bastian)(Morehead, Sarah)
December 11, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by Stanley Bastian Notice of Substitution (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Morehead, Sarah)
December 11, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P Downer on behalf of Jerry Martin, Todd Sprong (Attorney Jeffrey P Downer added to party Jerry Martin(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey P Downer added to party Todd Sprong(pty:dft))(Downer, Jeffrey)
December 7, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah K Morehead on behalf of Stanley Bastian (Attorney Sarah K Morehead added to party Stanley Bastian(pty:dft))(Morehead, Sarah)
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 Praecipe filed by DOJ, FBI, US Courts, USAO, USMS: Re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Description: Representation clarification. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Verschoor, Rudolf)
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by James Comey, DOJ, FBI, Ryan Johnsen, Robert J Mueller, Philip M Pro, Rod Rosenstein, James S Savett, US Courts, USAO, USMS. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Verschoor, Rudolf)
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under Fed R. Civ. 12(B)(6) by Benton County Prosecutor, Benton County Superior Court, Joseph Burrowes, Andy Miller. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Andrews, Eric)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Andrews on behalf of Benton County Prosecutor, Benton County Superior Court, Joseph Burrowes, Andy Miller (Attorney Eric Andrews added to party Benton County Superior Court(pty:dft))(Andrews, Eric)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P Downer on behalf of Canyon Lakes POA (Attorney Jeffrey P Downer added to party Canyon Lakes POA(pty:dft))(Downer, Jeffrey)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by FBI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certification of Scope of Employment, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Verschoor, Rudolf)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by FBI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Scope of Employment signed by USA, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Verschoor, Rudolf)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by FBI, US Courts, USMS Clarification re Representation (Verschoor, Rudolf)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(5) for State Defendants, by AG, DSHS-DCYF Offices, Bob Ferguson, Jay Inslee, OIC, State of Washington Governor. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Zimmerman, Frieda)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel R Comfort on behalf of Lisa Beaton, City of Kennewick Attorney Office, City of Kennewick Police Department, Ken Hohenberg (Attorney Joel R Comfort added to party Lisa Beaton(pty:dft), Attorney Joel R Comfort added to party City of Kennewick Attorney Office(pty:dft), Attorney Joel R Comfort added to party City of Kennewick Police Department(pty:dft), Attorney Joel R Comfort added to party Ken Hohenberg(pty:dft))(Comfort, Joel)
November 26, 2018 AMENDED Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (CV, Case Administrator)
November 26, 2018 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (SK, Case Administrator) Modified on 11/27/2018 to correct entry/filed date (CV, Case Administrator).
November 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Fee Waived. Filed by Philip Pro, James Comey, USMS, James S Savett, FBI, Robert Mueller, Ryan Johnsen, Rod Rosenstein, US Courts, Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Benton County Superior Court filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Verschoor, Rudolf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallup et al v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Courts
Represented By: Rudolf J Verschoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James S Savett
Represented By: Rudolf J Verschoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Rosenstein
Represented By: Rudolf J Verschoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennewick Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy USM Ryan Johnsen
Represented By: Rudolf J Verschoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah L Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton County Prosecutors Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley A Bastian
Represented By: Rudolf J Verschoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Pro
Represented By: Rudolf J Verschoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI
Represented By: Rudolf J Verschoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Mueller
Represented By: Rudolf J Verschoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Comey
Represented By: Rudolf J Verschoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canyon Lakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USMS
Represented By: Rudolf J Verschoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Denton Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Bastian
Represented By: Rudolf J Verschoor
Represented By: Sarah K Morehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton County Prosecutor
Represented By: Eric Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AG
Represented By: Frieda K Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Kreidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSHS-DCYF Offices
Represented By: Frieda K Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canyon Lakes POA
Represented By: Jeffrey P Downer
Represented By: Bret Uhrich
Represented By: Patrick Craig Walker
Represented By: Shea C Meehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly E Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Joseph Burrowes
Represented By: Eric Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Kennewick Attorney Office
Represented By: Lisa Beaton
Represented By: Joel R Comfort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Sprong
Represented By: Jeffrey P Downer
Represented By: Bret Uhrich
Represented By: Patrick Craig Walker
Represented By: Shea C Meehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington Governor
Represented By: Frieda K Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip M Pro
Represented By: Rudolf J Verschoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascena Retail Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Inslee
Represented By: Frieda K Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Ferguson
Represented By: Frieda K Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Hohenberg
Represented By: Lisa Beaton
Represented By: Joel R Comfort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Beaton
Represented By: Lisa Beaton
Represented By: Joel R Comfort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marisol Cintron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Martin
Represented By: Jeffrey P Downer
Represented By: Bret Uhrich
Represented By: Patrick Craig Walker
Represented By: Shea C Meehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OIC
Represented By: Frieda K Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah A Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOJ
Represented By: Rudolf J Verschoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Gail McAnallen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Mueller
Represented By: Rudolf J Verschoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gina Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Miller
Represented By: Eric Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Kennewick Police Department
Represented By: Lisa Beaton
Represented By: Joel R Comfort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton County Superior Court
Represented By: Eric Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Matrix Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAO
Represented By: Rudolf J Verschoor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivy Kohlquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Alan Monk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christi Lynn Gallop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christi Lynn Gallup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?