Trotter v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Michael Trotter
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 4:2019cv05103
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Edward F Shea
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Ta Lu on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Ryan Ta Lu added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Lu, Ryan)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Trotter re Commissioner of Social Security. (Hatfield, Chad)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals a lack of information regarding how Plaintiff provides for his necessary expenses. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Case Management Deadline set for 6/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (TR, Case Administrator)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(TR, Case Administrator)
May 3, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Edward F. Shea assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security IFP Pending Filed by Michael Trotter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Hatfield, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trotter v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Represented By: Ryan Ta Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Trotter
Represented By: Chad L Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?