Progressive Direct Insurance Company v. Madrigal de Mendoza et al
Plaintiff: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Defendant: Teresa Barrera, Liliana Alvarez Torres, Andrea Salazar, Esther Madrigal de Mendoza, Santos Castro, Maria Garcia, Maria Barajas De Inda and Jesus Mendoza
Case Number: 4:2019cv05181
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 24 DECLARATION by Rebekah Jones in Opposition re #16 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in Federal Court filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Lether, Thomas)
September 6, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in Federal Court filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas)
September 6, 2019 Filing 22 STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re #20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas)
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 DECLARATION by Rebekah Jones in Support re #20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Lether, Thomas)
September 6, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2019 at 03:00 PM in Richland Courtroom 189 before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lether, Thomas)
August 30, 2019 Filing 19 Rule 26 / Rule 16 Attorney Report by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ANDREA SALAZAR; granting #15 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Andrea Salazar. Party Andrea Salazar terminated. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (AY, Case Administrator)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO JESUS MENDOZA; granting Stipulated #14 Motion to Dismiss Jesus Mendoza. Party Jesus Mendoza terminated. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (AY, Case Administrator)
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in Federal Court by Esther Madrigal de Mendoza. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2019 at 01:00 PM in Richland Courtroom 189 before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Morfin, Edwardo)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss Andrea Salazar by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lether, Thomas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss Jesus Mendoza by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lether, Thomas)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 02:30 PM in via Teleconference before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company re Esther Madrigal de Mendoza. (Lether, Thomas)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant Esther Madrigal de Mendoza's ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Relief by Esther Madrigal de Mendoza.(Morfin, Edwardo)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance for Esther Madrigal de Mendoza by Edwardo Morfin on behalf of Esther Madrigal de Mendoza (Attorney Edwardo Morfin added to party Esther Madrigal de Mendoza(pty:dft))(Morfin, Edwardo)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE by Progressive Direct Insurance Company re Jesus Mendoza. (Lether, Thomas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE by Progressive Direct Insurance Company re Andrea Salazar. (Lether, Thomas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE by Progressive Direct Insurance Company re Santos Castro. (Lether, Thomas)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE by Progressive Direct Insurance Company re Teresa Barrera. (Lether, Thomas)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE by Progressive Direct Insurance Company re Maria Barajas De Inda. (Lether, Thomas)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE by Progressive Direct Insurance Company re Maria Garcia. (Lether, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued to Esther Madrigal De Mendoza (Attachments: #1 Summons Jesus Mendoza, #2 Summons Andrea Salazar, #3 Summons Liliana Alvarez Torres, #4 Summons Teresa Barrera, #5 Summons Maria Garcia, #6 Summons Santos Castro, #7 Summons Maria Barajas De Inda).(AY, Case Administrator)
July 11, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3209703) Filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Esther Madrigal de Mendoza, #3 Summons Jesus Mendoza, #4 Summons Andrea Salazar, #5 Summons Liliana Alvarez Torres, #6 Summons Teresa Barrera, #7 Summons Maria Garcia, #8 Summons Santos Castro, #9 Summons Maria Barajas de Inda)(Lether, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Direct Insurance Company v. Madrigal de Mendoza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Barrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liliana Alvarez Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esther Madrigal de Mendoza
Represented By: Edwardo Morfin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santos Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Barajas De Inda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Mendoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Direct Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?