Young v. Desert Villa Partners LP
Plaintiff: Judith L Young
Defendant: Desert Villa Partners LP and Desert Villa Apartments
Case Number: 4:2019cv05226
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Parties Stipulation and Motion to Continue Hearing Date on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and other Relief (ECF No. #7 ) is GRANTED. The Parties Stipulations are ACCEPTED by the Court. Further, Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due by November 13, 2019. Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Response is due by November 18, 2019. The hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction is reset, with oral argument, to be held 11/20/2019 at 11:00 a.m. at the Thomas S. Foley United States Courthouse, 920 West Riverside Avenue, Spokane, Washington, Courtroom 902. TEXT ONLY ORDER / NO PDF DOCUMENT. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION to Continue Hearing Date on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Other Relief by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2019 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Ramirez, Jessica)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on CT Corporation System, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ramirez, Jessica)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION by Rhys M. Farren in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Desert Villa Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Farren, Rhys)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rhys Matthew Farren on behalf of Desert Villa Partners LP (Attorney Rhys Matthew Farren added to party Desert Villa Partners LP(pty:dft))(Farren, Rhys)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Desert Villa Partners LP. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Judith L Young. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 Without Oral Argument before Honorable Judge Unassigned. (Crozier, Mark)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3261539) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pages 10 - 15, #2 Exhibit Pages 16 - 17, #3 Exhibit Page 18, #4 Exhibit Page 19, #5 Exhibit Page 20, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Crozier, Mark)
September 13, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Desert Villa Partners LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Villa Partners LP
Represented By: Rhys Matthew Farren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Villa Apartments
Represented By: Rhys Matthew Farren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith L Young
Represented By: Jessica Rose Ramirez
Represented By: Mark Benjamin Crozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?