Stolz v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Marcel Stolz
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv05246
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Case transferred from Washington Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-07402, filed 11/08/2019. (JW, ECF Admin)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (JW, ECF Admin)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 New case number 4:19-CV-5246-SMJ has been opened and assigned to Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr. Case number 2:19-CV-0346 has been CLOSED. Future filings should be made in this case ONLY. (CV, Case Administrator)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Marcel Stolz Pendency of Other Actions (Yackulic, Corrie)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3284767) Jury Demand. Filed by Marcel Stolz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Yackulic, Corrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stolz v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcel Stolz
Represented By: Corrie Johnson Yackulic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?