United States of America v. $717,201.44 US Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $717,201.44 U.S. CURR and $717,201.44 US Currency
Case Number: 4:2020cv05019
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 UNITED STATES' MOTION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator)
February 11, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant In Rem by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2020 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Warrant of Arrest In Rem)(Donovan, Brian)
February 6, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $717,201.44 U.S. CURR Fee Waived Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donovan, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $717,201.44 US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $717,201.44 U.S. CURR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $717,201.44 US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?